Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-09308

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Carol A Doyle
Case #: 1:22-ap-00170
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2022
Terminated:Dec 19, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ariane Holtschlag
Represented By
Ariane Holtschlag
contact info
Plaintiff
Ravi Chatwani
Represented By
Michael W Debre
Chuhak & Tecson, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
26 26 court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/19 6:49 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-170 Closed . (Chavez, Baldo)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
25 25 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Mon 12/18 6:19 PM
The Hearing Scheduled for December 19, 2023 is Stricken Related [+]. Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
24 24 misc Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 12/18 11:53 AM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jeffrey K. Paulsen on behalf of Ariane Holtschlag. (Paulsen, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
23 23 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 12/12 12:18 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 12/19/2023 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer, , , .. Signed on 12/12/2023. (McGee, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
22 22 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 10/31 2:11 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 12/12/2023 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer.. Signed on 10/31/2023. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
21 21 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 10/17 11:45 AM
(E)Status Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 10/31/2023 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer, , , .. Signed on 10/17/2023. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
20 20 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 09/12 10:57 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer.. Signed on 09/12/2023. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
19 19 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 08/16 11:25 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer.. Signed on 08/16/2023. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
18 18 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 06/21 12:06 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 08/16/2023 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer.. Signed on 06/21/2023. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, June 08, 2023
17 17 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 06/08 10:01 AM
(E)Hearing Rescheduled Related [+]. Status hearing rescheduled for 06/21/2023 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer.. Signed on 06/08/2023. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, May 18, 2023
16 16 order Reassignment Order with Certificate of Service Thu 05/18 11:45 AM
Reassignment Order with Certificate of Service. Judge Janet S. Baer added to case. Involvement of Judge Carol A. Doyle terminated . Signed on 5/18/2023 (Pilafov, Maria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
15 15 court Transcript Tue 04/04 9:46 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 02/23/23. Remote electronic access to the excerpt/transcript is restricted until 07/3/2023. The excerpt/transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, contact the Court Reporter D & E Reporting, Telephone number 312-986-1920. Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/18/2023. Redaction Request Due By 04/25/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 05/5/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 07/3/2023. (Doolin, Amy)
Related: [-] 14 Order Scheduling
Thursday, February 23, 2023
14 14 order Scheduling Fri 02/24 7:13 AM
Order Scheduling - Setting Discovery Cutoff and Status Hearing Related [+]. Discovery Cutoff 5/26/2023. Continued Status hearing to be held on 6/15/2023 at 10:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 742, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Doyle. Signed on 2/23/2023 (Chavez, Baldo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
13 13 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 02/23 5:52 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 742, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Doyle.. Signed on 02/23/2023. (Patterson, Carlos)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, February 09, 2023
12 12 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 02/09 12:37 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 742, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Doyle.. Signed on 02/09/2023. (Patterson, Carlos)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Counterclaim Tue 02/07 10:11 AM
Amended Answer to Counterclaim Filed by Michael W Debre on behalf of Ravi Chatwani. (Debre, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Counterclaim Tue 01/17 5:02 PM
Answer to Counterclaim Filed by Michael W Debre on behalf of Ravi Chatwani. (Debre, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
9 9 cmp Counterclaim Tue 12/27 3:40 PM
Counterclaim by Ariane Holtschlag against Ravi Chatwani (Paulsen, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/27 3:39 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Jeffrey K. Paulsen on behalf of Ariane Holtschlag. (Paulsen, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
7 7 order Extend Time Fri 12/02 8:52 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+]. Response due by 12/23/2022. Signed on 12/1/2022. (Chavez, Baldo)
Related: [-] 4
6 6 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 12/01 12:51 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 742, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Doyle.. Signed on 12/01/2022. (Patterson, Carlos)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
5 5 misc Appearance Tue 11/29 1:19 PM
Appearance Filed by Isaiah A Fishman on behalf of Ariane Holtschlag. (Fishman, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
4 4 motion Extend Time Fri 11/18 10:38 AM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Jeffrey K. Paulsen on behalf of Ariane Holtschlag. Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2022 at 10:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 742, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Doyle. (Paulsen, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
3 3 crditcrd none Wed 10/26 12:22 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-00170 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B45350189. Fee Amount $ 350.00 (Debre, Michael) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 10/26 12:16 PM
Summons Issued on Ariane Holtschlag Answer Due 11/25/2022 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/26 12:16 PM
Adversary case 22-00170 (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))): Complaint by Ravi Chatwani against Ariane Holtschlag. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 12/1/2022 at 10:30 AM at Appear Using Zoom for Government - Judge Doyle. (Debre, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4