Pirl et al v. Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03854 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land |
Case Filed: | Oct 31, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 27, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Monroe County Court of Common Pleas, 22-00269 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 29, 2023 5:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.
3366 Riverside Drive, Suite 103
Upper Arlington, OH 43221 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela K. Pirl
47020 Hidden Acres Road
Clarington, OH 43915 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon R. Pirl
47893 Cain Ridge Road
Clarington, OH 43915 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
49 | 49
![]() ORDER of USCA as to46 Notice of Appeal filed by Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl: The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Note: Mandate to issue. (er) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2025 | ||
48 | 48
![]() ORDER of USCA as to46 Notice of Appeal - ORDER filed granting motion to substitute Rice Drilling D, LLC for Equinor USA Onshore Properties, Inc. Note: No Mandate details noted . (kh) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2024 | ||
47 | 47
![]() USCA Case Number 24-3838 for46 Notice of Appeal, filed by Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl. (pb) |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2024 | ||
46 | 46
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL re45 Judgment,44 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, (Filing fee $ 605 has been paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10179449) by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl. (Onest, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
45 | 45
![]() JUDGMENT in favor of Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc. entered pursuant to the Opinion and Order signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/27/2024. Case Terminated. (kk2) |
|
44 | 44
![]() OPINION AND ORDER granting36 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying37 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/27/2024. (kk2) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re36 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.. (McGranor, Timothy) Modified text of title on 6/24/2024 (mas) |
|
42 | 42
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re37 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl. (Onest, Matthew) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re36 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl. (Onest, Matthew) |
|
40 | 40
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re37 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.. (McGranor, Timothy) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 05/20 8:45 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Summary Judgment Briefing. Responses due by 6/10/2024 Replies due by 6/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/20/24. (jr) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 6/10/2024. by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl. (Onest, Matthew) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
![]() MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl. (Onest, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
36 | 36
![]() MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.. (McGranor, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
![]() DEPOSITION of Defendant's 30(B)(5) Representative Bret Dockter taken on January 16, 2024 by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl. (Onest, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
34 | 34
![]() NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION of Defendant's 30(B)(5) Representative Bret Dockter by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl. (Onest, Matthew) |
|
33 | 33
![]() DEPOSITION of Defendant's 30(B)(5) Representative Mary Lou Fry, Esq. taken on January 16, 2024 by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl. (Onest, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
32 | 32
![]() NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION of Defendant's 30(B)(5) Rep Mary Lou Fry, Esq. by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl. (Onest, Matthew) |
|
31 | 31
![]() DEPOSITION of Pamela Pirl taken on September 15, 2023 by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl. (Onest, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
30 | 30
![]() NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION of Pamela Pirl by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl. (Onest, Matthew) Modified on 5/3/2024 to correct deponent name (kk2) |
|
29 | 29
![]() DEPOSITION of Shannon Pirl taken on September 15, 2023 by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl. (Onest, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
28 | 28
![]() NOTICE by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl Notice of Filing Deposition of Plaintiff, Shannon Pirl (Onest, Matthew) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() NOTICE by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl of Withdrawal of Attorney Horvath (Onest, Matthew) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER re24 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (to correct reply in support of dispositive motions deadline from June 10, 2014 to June 10, 2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/16/2023. (kk2) |
|
24 | 24
![]() ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/16/2023. (kk2) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines
Mon 10/16 3:18 PM
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines per25 : Discovery (Fact) due by 1/22/2024. Primary Expert due by 2/26/2024. Rebuttal Expert due by 3/29/2024. Dispositive motions due by 5/6/2024 - Responses due by 5/27/2024 - Replies due by 6/10/2024. (kk2) |
||
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 1/22/2024. by Defendant Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.. (Fazekas, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 08/10 8:37 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions. Fact Discovery due by 10/24/2023; Primary Experts due by 11/28/2023; Rebuttal Experts due by 12/30/2023; Dispositive Motions due by 2/6/2024 - Responses due by 2/27/2024 - Replies due by 3/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/10/2023. (kk2) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 10/24/2023. and File Dispositive Motions by Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl. (Onest, Matthew) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator Matthew R. Harris to conduct mediation in Online (ZOOM). Mediation Hearing set for 9/20/2023 at 09:00 AM. (Harris, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
med
Notice Designating Mediator
Tue 08/01 10:42 AM
NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Matthew R Harris assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in September 2023, or within 60 days of this notice . The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2) |
||
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in September 2023 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm EST on 7/31/2023 . (kk2) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in July 2023 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm EST on 5/30/2023 . (kk2) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in May 2023 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm EST on 3/31/2023 . (kk2) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin John Horvath for Plaintiffs Pamela K. Pirl, Shannon R. Pirl (Horvath, Benjamin) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/30/2023. (kk2) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.. (Fazekas, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2022 is VACATED. Initial Disclosures due by 12/16/2022; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 1/27/2023; Discovery due by 8/25/2023; Protective Order or Clawback Agreement due by 1/27/2023; Dispositive motions due by 12/8/2023; Primary Expert due by 9/29/2023; Rebuttal Expert due by 10/31/2023; Settlement Demand due by 4/3/2023; Response to Settlement Demand due by 5/5/2023; Case is referred to Mediation in 5/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/7/2022. (kk2) |
|
11 | 11
![]() ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kimberly A. Jolson. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/7/2022. (jk) |
|
10 | 10
![]() RULE 26(f) REPORT (Joint) by Defendant Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.. (McGranor, Timothy) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Mon 11/28 8:58 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting7 Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Conference reset for 12/14/2022 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/28/22. (jr) |
||
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ANSWER to3 Complaint filed by Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.. (Fazekas, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Defendant Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.. (McGranor, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 07, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() STIPULATION by Defendant Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.. (Fazekas, Matthew) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/07 8:19 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc. answer due 11/21/2022. (er) |
||
Tuesday, November 01, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2022 10:15 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Benjamin J. Horvath. (tla) |
|
3 | 3
![]() COMPLAINT against Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc., filed by Pamela K. Pirl and Shannon R. Pirl. Originally filed in the Monroe County Court of Common Pleas on 09/29/2022, Case No. 22-00269 (tla) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc., Equinor USA Properties Inc., Equinor US Holdings Inc., Equinor ASA identifying Corporate Parent Equinor USA Properties Inc., Other Affiliate Equinor US Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Equinor ASA for Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc... (Fazekas, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-269, filed by Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.. (Fazekas, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |