Original Case: 2:22-cv-03854

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-03838
Typecivil / private / diversity
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2024
Terminated:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 5:35 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
EQUINOR USA ONSHORE PROPERTIES INC., fka Statoil USA Onshore Properties, Inc.
Represented By
Timothy Brian McGranor
Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RICE DRILLING D, LLC, successor in interest to Equinor USA Onshore Properties, Inc.
Represented By
John Kevin West
Steptoe & Johnson
contact info
John Charles Ferrell
Steptoe & Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
PAMELA K. PIRL
Represented By
Matthew W. Onest
Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths & Dougherty
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SHANNON R. PIRL
Represented By
Matthew W. Onest
Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths & Dougherty
contact info

GPO May 12 2025
UNPUBLISHED OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : AFFIRMED. Mandate to issue. Decision not for publication. R. Guy Cole, Jr., David W. McKeague (AUTHORING), and Kevin G. Ritz, Circuit Judges.

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 5:35 AM CDT
Thursday, September 26, 2024
The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Pamela K. Pirl and Shannon R. Pirl. Transcript needed: n. (ASM)
Related: [-]