Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12744

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:22-ap-01272
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2022
Terminated:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
MountainSky Landscaping LLC, MountainSky Landscaping, LLC
4467 Clay Street
Boulder, CO 80301
Represented By
MountainSky Landscaping LLC
contact info
Defendant
Peter Scott Churchill, Peter Churchill
4467 Clay Street
Boulder, CO 80301
Represented By
Peter Scott Churchill
contact info
Defendant
Shiloh Staedler Churchill, Shiloh Churchill
4467 Clay Street
Boulder, CO 80301
Represented By
Shiloh Staedler Churchill
contact info
Defendant
Luca Staedler Churchill, Luca Shiloh
4467 Clay Street
Boulder, CO 80301
Represented By
Luca Staedler Churchill
contact info
Plaintiff
68th Place Arvada, LLC
Represented By
Andrew Gerhard Oh-Willeke
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, November 07, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/07 12:23 PM
Adversary Case Number 22-1272 Closed. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/25 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 10/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/23 10:18 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 10/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order to File
20 20 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) Wed 10/23 1:12 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (mmg)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 10/23 1:12 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-1272 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 11/6/2024. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
19 19 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 10/22 9:38 AM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of Luca Staedler Churchill, Peter Scott Churchill, Shiloh Staedler Churchill, MountainSky Landscaping LLC Related [+]. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Monday, October 21, 2024
18 18 order File Mon 10/21 10:47 AM
Order for Status Report. Related [+]. Document due by 11/4/2024 for1 , (mmg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, September 21, 2023
17 17 order Abeyance Thu 09/21 2:01 PM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion To Hold Adversary Action In Abeyance Related [+]. The Court, having reviewed the unopposed motion and for good cause shown, hereby orders that adversary action numbers 22-01272 22-1306 22-1308 and 22-1310 brought by 68th Place Arvada, LLC, against debtors Mountainsky Landscaping, LLC, Peter Scott Churchill, Shiloh Churchill and Luca Churchill shall be held in abeyance until November 30,2023.
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
16 16 motion Abeyance Wed 09/20 4:31 PM
Unopposed Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by Andrew Gerhard Oh-Willeke on behalf of 68th Place Arvada, LLC. (Oh-Willeke, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Monday, July 17, 2023
court Public Entry Regarding Case Reassignment Mon 07/17 1:26 PM
Notice of Reassignment of Case. Judge Kimberley H. Tyson added to case. Involvement of Judge Michael E. Romero terminated. This reassignment is for internal purposes only. Any hearing currently scheduled may be rescheduled. A separate notice will be issued if a hearing is rescheduled. Any pleadings in this matter must display the initials KHT after the case number. (leg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
15 15 3 pgs court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/02 10:19 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 03/02/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
14 14 order Abeyance Tue 02/28 2:03 PM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion To Hold Adversary In Abeyance Related [+]. Document due by 5/24/2023 for12 and for1 . (dmu)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,12 Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Thursday, February 23, 2023
13 13 utility Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry) Thu 02/23 7:26 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. is hereby notified of the following error in : A proposed order was not submitted with the motion . E-Filer shall email a proposed order in PDF format to cob_proposedorders@cob.uscourts.gov. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) Related [+]. (dmu)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
12 12 motion Abeyance Wed 02/22 10:37 PM
Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by Andrew Gerhard Oh-Willeke on behalf of 68th Place Arvada, LLC. (Oh-Willeke, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Order Granting Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance
Sunday, January 22, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/22 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 01/22/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order to File
Thursday, January 19, 2023
10 10 order File Thu 01/19 10:29 AM
Order for Compliance with Rule 7026, Fed.R.Bankr.P. (Rule 26(f), (Fed.R.Civ.P.) (related document(s)1 Complaint,9 Answer to Complaint). Document due by 2/21/2023 for9 and for1 . (dmu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/18 12:24 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of Luca Staedler Churchill, Peter Scott Churchill, Shiloh Staedler Churchill, MountainSky Landscaping LLC Related [+]. (Conrardy, Aaron)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, January 13, 2023
court Notice of Judge Reassignment for KHT Cases Fri 01/13 4:08 PM
Notice of Reassignment of Case. This case has been temporarily reassigned for internal court purposes. Pending hearings may be rescheduled by a separate notice. Judge Michael E. Romero added to case. Involvement of Judge Kimberley H. Tyson terminated. Any pleadings filed in this matter must display the initials MER in the case number. Please contact Judge Tyson's chambers at 720-904-7362 with any questions about this case . (rjr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
court Notice of Judge Reassignment for KHT Cases Wed 01/11 4:39 PM
Notice of Reassignment of Case. This case has been temporarily reassigned for internal court purposes. Pending hearings may be rescheduled by a separate notice. Judge Michael E. Romero added to case. Involvement of Judge Kimberley H. Tyson terminated. Any pleadings filed in this matter must display the initials MER in the case number. Please contact Judge Tyson's chambers at 720-904-7362 with any questions about this case. (rjr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/16 10:38 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
7 7 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Tue 12/13 2:26 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Luca Staedler Churchill Answer Due 1/20/2023; Peter Scott Churchill Answer Due 1/20/2023; Shiloh Staedler Churchill Answer Due 1/20/2023; MountainSky Landscaping LLC Answer Due 1/20/2023 Related [+]. (dmu)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, December 12, 2022
6 6 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 12/12 12:22 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of Luca Staedler Churchill, Peter Scott Churchill, Shiloh Staedler Churchill, MountainSky Landscaping LLC. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 12/12 12:21 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of Luca Staedler Churchill, Peter Scott Churchill, Shiloh Staedler Churchill, MountainSky Landscaping LLC Related [+]. (Conrardy, Aaron)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Monday, November 21, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/21 7:20 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Andrew Gerhard Oh-Willeke on behalf of 68th Place Arvada, LLC Related [+]. (Oh-Willeke, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, November 18, 2022
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 11/18 3:30 PM
Summons Issued on Luca Staedler Churchill Answer Due 12/19/2022; Peter Scott Churchill Answer Due 12/19/2022; Shiloh Staedler Churchill Answer Due 12/19/2022; MountainSky Landscaping LLC Answer Due 12/19/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Oh-Willeke, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 10/31 8:53 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01272 KHT] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31608265. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/31 8:51 PM
Adversary case 22-01272 Complaint by Andrew Oh-Willeke against MountainSky Landscaping LLC, Peter Scott Churchill, Shiloh Staedler Churchill, Luca Staedler Churchill. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 02/28/2023 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Oh-Willeke, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Summons