Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:22-ap-05068
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2022
Terminated:Aug 29, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
GROHAPPY INC.
Represented By
GROHAPPY INC.
contact info
Plaintiff
Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust
Represented By
Aaron L. Hammer
Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
court Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 08/29 3:06 PM
Adversary Proceeding 22-5068 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
9 9 order Default Judgment Thu 08/17 1:26 PM
Order GRANTING Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] (bjp)
Related: [-] 6
8 8 audio Audio File Thu 08/17 1:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/17/2023 9:06:29 AM ]. File Size [ 261 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:05 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Hearing Held Thu 08/17 12:35 PM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held Related [+]. (bjp)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Thursday, July 27, 2023
6 6 motion Default Judgment Thu 07/27 4:40 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against GROHAPPY INC., filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. Hearing scheduled for 8/17/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, July 21, 2023
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 07/21 1:55 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default, Grohappy Inc. (rah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
4 4 motion Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 07/18 1:33 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, November 04, 2022
3 3 court Summons Service Executed Fri 11/04 3:56 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Delman, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Thu 11/03 9:23 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/01 5:34 PM
Adversary case 22-05068 Complaint, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC against GROHAPPY INC. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A