PENNSYLVANIA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP et al v. SCHMIDT et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Paradise Baxter |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00339 |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Cause | no cause specified |
Case Filed: | Nov 04, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 21, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday May 04, 2023 5:46 AM EDT |
Amicus
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Restoring Integrity and Trust in Elections, Inc.
1233 20th Street NW Suite 350
Washington, DC 20036 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
PIKE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
|
Defendant
LACKAWANNA COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PHILADELPHIA COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PERRY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NORTHUMBERLAND COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MONTOUR COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MIFFLIN COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
|
Defendant
MERCER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
|
Defendant
MCKEAN COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LYCOMING COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LUZERNE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LEHIGH COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LEBANON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LAWRENCE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LANCASTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MONROE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VENANGO COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AL SCHMIDT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Attorney WASHINGTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Vorys Sater Seymour and Pease LLP 500 Grant St., Ste. 4900
Pittsburgh, PA 15219 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
WAYNE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
|
Defendant
YORK COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WYOMING COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WESTMORELAND COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WASHINGTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WARREN COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
POTTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UNION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TIOGA COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SUSQUEHANNA COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SULLIVAN COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SOMERSET COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SNYDER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SCHUYLKILL COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BUTLER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CLINTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
|
Defendant
CLEARFIELD COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
|
Defendant
CLARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CARBON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CAMERON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
|
Defendant
CAMBRIA COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BUCKS COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JUNIATA COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BRADFORD COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
|
Defendant
BLAIR COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BERKS COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BEDFORD COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BEAVER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ARMSTRONG COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
|
Defendant
ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ADAMS COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CRAWFORD COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JEFFERSON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
INDIANA COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HUNTINGDON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GREENE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FULTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
|
Defendant
FRANKLIN COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FOREST COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FAYETTE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ERIE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ELK COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
|
Defendant
DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DAUPHIN COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CUMBERLAND COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
REPUBLICAN PARTY OF PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
NATIONAL REPUBLICAN CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEEE
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LAURENCE M. SMITH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PENNSYLVANIA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
COMMON CAUSE PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BARRY M. SEASTEAD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AYNNE MARGARET PLEBAN POLINSKI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARLENE G. GUTIERREZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOEL BENCAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PHILADELPHIANS ORGANIZED TO WITNESS, EMPOWER AND REBUILD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BLACK POLITICAL EMPOWERMENT PROJECT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MAKE THE ROAD PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Intervenor
VALLERIE SICILIANO-BIANCANIELLO
Terminated: 01/06/2023
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
LYNN MARIE KALCEVIC
Terminated: 01/06/2023
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
ROSS M. FARBER
Terminated: 01/06/2023
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
S. MICHAEL STREIB
Terminated: 01/06/2023
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
GWENDOLYN MAE DELUCA
Terminated: 01/06/2023
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
JESSE D. DANIEL
Terminated: 01/06/2023
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
DEBRA BIRO
Terminated: 01/06/2023
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
JAMES D. BEE
Terminated: 01/06/2023
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
DAVID BALL
Terminated: 01/06/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEAN TERRIZZI
Terminated: 04/11/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DEBORAH DIEHL
Terminated: 04/11/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARJORIE BOYLE
Terminated: 04/11/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
383 | 383
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 04/12 9:55 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Motions to Withdraw as Attorney by WASHINGTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, ECF No.381 and382 . Jana Phillis Grimm, Esq. and Lauren L. Mathews, Esq. are terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 4/12/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (snc) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
382 | 382
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 04/11 10:21 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by WASHINGTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Mathews, Lauren) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
381 | 381
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 04/11 10:17 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by WASHINGTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Grimm, Jana) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
misc
QC - Incorrect document is attached
Thu 04/11 1:31 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re380 Notice of Appearance,378 Notice of Appearance,379 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: EACH DOCUMENT HAS THE INCORRECT COURT IN THE CAPTION. CORRECTION: EACH Attorney advised to refile their respective Entry of Appearance, using the Errata event and attach the correct document. Each document should have the correct court in the caption, "United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania" ADDITIONALLY, EACH ATTORNEY FILING AN APPEARANCE SHOULD HAVE THEIR OWN DOCUMENT LISTING ONLY THEIR NAME TO ENTER THEIR APPEARANCE, SIGNED BY THAT ATTORNEY, USING THAT ATTORNEYS ACCOUNT TO FILE SAID ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (jd) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
380 | 380
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/10 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Ann Scott on behalf of WASHINGTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Scott, Sarah) |
|
379 | 379
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/10 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Ann Scott on behalf of WASHINGTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Scott, Sarah) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
378 | 378
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Ann Scott on behalf of WASHINGTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Scott, Sarah) |