Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Brandy R Mcmillion
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:22-cv-12742
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2022
Terminated:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 11, 2023 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Addison Community Schools
Represented By
Gregory W. Mair
O'Neill, Wallace,
contact info
Defendant
Kim Ford
Represented By
Gregory W. Mair
O'Neill, Wallace,
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Frost
Represented By
Gregory W. Mair
O'Neill, Wallace,
contact info
Defendant
Steve Guerra
Represented By
Gregory W. Mair
O'Neill, Wallace,
contact info
Defendant
Michael Murphy
Represented By
Gregory W. Mair
O'Neill, Wallace,
contact info
Defendant
Josh Perry
Represented By
Gregory W. Mair
O'Neill, Wallace,
contact info
Defendant
Andrea Woodring
Represented By
Gregory W. Mair
O'Neill, Wallace,
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Patterson
Represented By
Gregory W. Mair
O'Neill, Wallace,
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott W Williams
Represented By
Jeffrey L. Herron
Herron Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 28, 2025
56 56 appeal Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit* Fri 02/28 3:38 PM
Certificate of Service re55 Notice of Appeal. (JBro)
Related: [-]
55 55 appeal Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit Fri 02/28 2:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by All Plaintiffs re54 Judgment,53 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10137622 - Fee: $ 605 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Herron, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]