Original Case: 2:22-cv-12742

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01205
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 06, 2025 2:15 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
ADDISON COMMUNITY SCHOOLS
Represented By
Gregory William Mair
O'Neill, Wallace & Doyle
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOSH PERRY
Represented By
Gregory William Mair
O'Neill, Wallace & Doyle
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL MURPHY
Represented By
Gregory William Mair
O'Neill, Wallace & Doyle
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JENNIFER FROST
Represented By
Gregory William Mair
O'Neill, Wallace & Doyle
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANDREA WOODRING
Represented By
Gregory William Mair
O'Neill, Wallace & Doyle
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KIM FORD
Represented By
Gregory William Mair
O'Neill, Wallace & Doyle
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STEVE GUERRA
Represented By
Gregory William Mair
O'Neill, Wallace & Doyle
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SCOTT W. WILLIAMS
Represented By
Jeffrey L. Herron
Herron Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/06/2025 2:15 AM CST
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Scott W. Williams. Transcript needed: y. (MMP)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Addison Community Schools, Kim Ford, Jennifer Frost, Steve Guerra, Michael Murphy, Josh Perry and Andrea Woodring by Gregory W. Mair. Certificate of Service: 03/05/2025. 25-1205 (GWM)
Related: [-]