Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01433
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2022
Terminated:Mar 31, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Supreme Parts Repair, LLC
Represented By
Supreme Parts Repair, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, March 31, 2023
10 10 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/31 8:45 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1433 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/17 5:16 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 8 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
8 8 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 03/15 11:35 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding [Settlement] . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Tue 03/07 3:31 PM
Notice of Filing Trustee Kapilas Notice Of Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/24 2:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 5 Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference
Friday, January 20, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference Fri 01/20 12:32 PM
Order Resetting Scheduling Conference and Related Relief Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 02/09/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/30 2:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 11/23 10:29 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 11/23 10:28 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Supreme Parts Repair, LLC Answer Due 12/23/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 01/12/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01433 Complaint.
Monday, November 21, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/21 12:29 PM
Adversary case 22-01433 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Supreme Parts Repair, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]