Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:22-bk-10886

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erik P Kimball
Case #: 9:22-ap-01434
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2022
Terminated:Apr 24, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Panagiotis Kechagias
10310 Boca Woods Ln
Boca Raton, FL 33428
Represented By
Panagiotis Kechagias
contact info
Plaintiff
GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts
1300 North Federal Highway Suite 203, Squires Building
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Represented By
Leslie S. Osborne, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Fairmont Capital, LLC
1300 North Federal Highway Suite 203, Squires Building
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Represented By
Leslie S. Osborne, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, April 24, 2023
20 20 court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/24 1:30 PM
Adversary Case 9:22-ap-1434 Closed. Complaint Dismissed as Stipulated (Leonard, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
19 19 2 pgs notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Thu 04/06 2:35 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal by All Parties who Have Appeared Filed by Defendant Panagiotis Kechagias *Replaces de #18* (Montygierd, Hebe)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/05 2:10 PM
Notice of Filing Stipulation of Dismissal by all Parties Who Have Appeared , Filed by Defendant Panagiotis Kechagias. (Dorsey, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
17 17 6 pgs court Notification of Returned Mail Mon 04/03 4:25 PM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Ortman, Martha)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
16 16 4 pgs misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Mon 03/27 3:16 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Defendant Panagiotis Kechagias. (Dorsey, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
15 15 4 pgs misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Wed 03/22 3:32 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiffs Fairmont Capital, LLC, GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts. (Osborne, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 12, 2023
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 03/13 1:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts, Plaintiff Fairmont Capital, LLC). Pretrial Conference set for 09/13/2023 at 09:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401.
Friday, March 10, 2023
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/10 4:08 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiffs Fairmont Capital, LLC, GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts Related [+]. (Osborne, Leslie)
Related: [-] 12 Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial
12 12 5 pgs order Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial Fri 03/10 3:37 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. Related [+]. Pretrial Conference set for 09/13/2023 at 09:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts, Plaintiff Fairmont Capital, LLC
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
11 11 4 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/22 2:56 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Panagiotis Kechagias. (Dorsey, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
10 10 court Notice of Continued Hearing in Open Court [TEXT ONLY] Wed 02/08 3:57 PM
Clerk's Notice of Continued Hearing. **This continuance was announced on the record in open court on 2/8/23 @ 9:30 am. This docket entry contains no underlying PDF image.** Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 03/08/2023 at 09:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. Although the Court will conduct the hearing in person, any interested party may choose to attend the hearing remotely via Zoom.[LINK:To register, click on the link on the Court's webpage.] (Leonard, Dawn)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01434 Complaint by GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts, Fairmont Capital, LLC against Panagiotis Kechagias. Nature of Suit:,(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" (Hermes Complaint)) (Osborne, Leslie) Modified on 11/22/2022-to edit text .
Thursday, December 22, 2022
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 12/23 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 12/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Admitting Attorney Shanna M. Kaminski Pro Hac Vice (Re:5 )
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/21 11:31 AM
Certificate of Service (Amended) Filed by Plaintiff GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts Related [+]. (Osborne, Leslie)
Related: [-] 5 Ex Parte Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Shanna M. Kaminski [Fee Paid $200] filed by Plaintiff GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts,6 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice,7 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/21 11:27 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts Related [+]. (Osborne, Leslie)
Related: [-] 5 Ex Parte Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Shanna M. Kaminski [Fee Paid $200] filed by Plaintiff GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts,6 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
6 6 3 pgs order Appear pro hac vice Order Tue 12/20 8:48 AM
Order Admitting Attorney Shanna M. Kaminski Pro Hac Vice Related [+] (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-] #5
Friday, December 16, 2022
5 5 3 pgs motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 12/16 10:05 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Shanna M. Kaminski [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Plaintiff GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts (Osborne, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Affidavit
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 12/16 10:05 AM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice([LINK 22-01434 EPK] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A41823928. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
4 4 1 pgs cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/22 3:15 PM
Summons Service Executed on Panagiotis Kechagias 11/22/2022 Filed by Plaintiffs Fairmont Capital, LLC, GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts, Defendant Panagiotis Kechagias. (Osborne, Leslie)
Related: [-]
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Tue 11/22 9:39 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 3 pgs court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Tue 11/22 9:39 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Panagiotis Kechagias Answer Due 12/22/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 02/08/2023 at 09:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01434 Complaint by GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts, Fairmont Capital, LLC against Panagiotis Kechagias. Nature of Suit:,(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" (Hermes Complaint)) (Osborne, Leslie) Modified on 11/22/2022-to edit text . filed by Plaintiff GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts, Plaintiff Fairmont Capital, LLC
Monday, November 21, 2022
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/21 2:07 PM
Adversary case 22-01434 Complaint by GFE NY, LLC d/b/a Global Funding Experts, Fairmont Capital, LLC against Panagiotis Kechagias. Nature of Suit:,(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Osborne, Leslie) Modified on 11/22/2022-to edit text (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 247 pgs Exhibit "A" (Hermes Complaint)