Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erik P Kimball
Case #: 9:22-bk-10886
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Mar 08, 2022
Claims Deadline:Jun 10, 2022
Discharged:Dec 04, 2023
Discharge Objection Deadline:May 09, 2022

Debtor
Panagiotis Kechagias
10310 Boca Woods Ln
Boca Raton, FL 33428-1828
Represented By
Joshua Lanphear
Shraiberg Page, P.A.
contact info
Bradley S Shraiberg
contact info
Patrick R Dorsey
Shraiberg Page, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Robert C Furr
www.furrtrustee.com 2255 Glades Road Ste 419A
Boca Raton, FL 33431
Represented By
Marc P Barmat
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 03/11/2024 8:03 PM EDT
Thursday, February 03, 2022
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 02/03 10:36 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 22-10886 [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40423000. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF] Thu 02/03 10:32 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $338] (Shraiberg, Bradley)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs court Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) [Auto] Thu 02/03 10:32 AM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 03/08/2022 at 10:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Objections to Discharge/Dischargeability due by 05/09/2022. (Shraiberg, Bradley)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Social Security Number(s) Thu 02/03 10:32 AM
Statement of Debtor(s) Social Security Number(s) [ Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users ] Filed by Debtor Panagiotis Kechagias. (Shraiberg, Bradley)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs misc Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course Thu 02/03 10:48 AM
Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course by Debtor Filed by Debtor Panagiotis Kechagias. (Shraiberg, Bradley)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs attydoc Disclosure of Compensation Thu 02/03 11:01 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor by Attorney Bradley S Shraiberg. (Shraiberg, Bradley)
Related: [-]