Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. v. H.I. Quality Steel Castings Limited
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John E Hoffman Jr |
Case #: | 2:22-ap-02041 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 21, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
H.I. Quality Steel Castings Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al.
410 Park Avenue Suite 900
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 08/21 3:02 PM
Adversary Case 2:22-ap-2041 Closed (kam) |
||
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Dismissal (AP)
Thu 08/10 10:02 AM
Notice of Dismissal (AP) Filed by Plaintiff Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al.. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Saturday, July 22, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
BNC
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
Sun 07/23 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 07/22/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Default Judgment
Thu 07/20 2:58 PM
Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment (kam) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Document
Thu 07/20 1:07 PM
Document (Certificate of No Objection) Filed by Plaintiff Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. . (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Response
Tue 03/21 2:35 PM
Response to Filed by Plaintiff Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
10 | 10
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 03/21 1:24 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Sunday, March 12, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
BNC
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
Mon 03/13 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 03/12/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Proposed Dismissal
Fri 03/10 9:59 AM
Order Proposing Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Objections Due: 3/31/2023. (kam) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
BNC
Certificate of Mailing - BNC
Sat 12/03 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 12/02/2022. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
BNC
Certificate of Mailing - BNC
Sat 12/03 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 12/02/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
order
Regarding Document Filed in Improper Format
Wed 11/30 2:43 PM
Order of Deficiency Regarding Document Filed in Improper Format . (kam) |
|
4 | 4
order
Regarding Document Filed in Improper Format
Wed 11/30 2:42 PM
Order of Deficiency Regarding Document Filed in Improper Format . (kam) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 11/29 1:28 PM
Summons Service Executed on H.I. Quality Steel Castings Limited 11/29/2022 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Summons Issued
Tue 11/29 12:29 PM
Summons Issued on H.I. Quality Steel Castings Limited Date Issued 11/29/2022, Answer Due 12/29/2022 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/21 1:42 PM
Adversary case 2:22-ap-02041. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. against H.I. Quality Steel Castings Limited. Fee Amount $350 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |