Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:James R Sacca
Case #: 2:22-bk-21202
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2022
Terminated:Feb 07, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Jul 11, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Div005 LLC
880 Airport Rd
Winder, GA 30680-4162
Represented By
Cameron M. McCord
Jones & Walden, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Building 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303
Represented By
David S. Weidenbaum
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Thursday, May 22, 2025
444 444 notice Notice (BK) Thu 05/22 2:33 PM
Notice of Third Tolling and Stand Still Agreement of Insiders Filed by Todd E. Hennings on behalf of Todd E. Hennings as Litigation Trustee. (Hennings, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
443 443 notice Notice (BK) Wed 05/21 10:09 AM
Notice of Third Tolling And Standstill Agreement regarding Quality Panels & Trim, LLC Filed by Todd E. Hennings on behalf of Todd E. Hennings as Litigation Trustee. (Hennings, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
442 442 notice Notice (BK) Tue 05/20 9:49 AM
Notice of Third Tolling And Standstill Agreement regarding KLB Steel Filed by Todd E. Hennings on behalf of Todd E. Hennings as Litigation Trustee. (Hennings, Todd)
Related: [-]