Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-21202

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:James R Sacca
Case #: 2:24-ap-02056
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wagner Service Solutions, Inc., d/b/a Wagner Staffing
1420 Peachtree St. NE Suite 800
Atlanta, GA 30309
Represented By
Wagner Service Solutions, Inc., d/b/a Wagner Staffing
contact info
Plaintiff
Todd Hennings, in his capacity as Litigation Trustee of the DIV005 Creditor Trust
5500 Interstate North Parkway Suite 435
Atlanta, GA 30328
Represented By
Quan Andy Thanh Nguyen
Small Herrin, LLP
contact info
Benjamin S. Klehr
Small Herrin, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
11 11 misc P-Attorney Disclosure Statement Fri 04/04 4:15 PM
Attorney Disclosure Statement filed by Frederick Owen Ferrand on behalf of Wagner Service Solutions, Inc., d/b/a Wagner Staffing. (Ferrand, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
10 10 misc Discovery Response Thu 03/20 6:19 PM
Discovery Response (specify): (Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures) Filed by Benjamin S. Klehr on behalf of Todd Hennings, in his capacity as Litigation Trustee of the DIV005 Creditor Trust. (Klehr, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order (492) Fri 02/21 1:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Notice Date 02/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 order 01-Order Tue 02/18 1:15 PM
Scheduling Order. Ordered that the time limits and provisions stated in the Report are approved. Service by BNC. Entered on 2/18/2025. Related [+] (jwc)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, February 14, 2025
7 7 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Conference Fri 02/14 4:30 PM
Report of Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Benjamin S. Klehr on behalf of Todd Hennings, in his capacity as Litigation Trustee of the DIV005 Creditor Trust. (Klehr, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/31 4:21 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Frederick Owen Ferrand on behalf of Wagner Service Solutions, Inc., d/b/a Wagner Staffing.1 (Ferrand, Frederick) Modified on 2/3/2025 (gnh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
5 5 misc|notice Stipulation|Acknowledgement of Service Thu 12/19 3:22 PM
Acknowledgement of Service of Summons & Complaint , Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Filed by Quan Andy Thanh Nguyen on behalf of Todd Hennings, in his capacity as Litigation Trustee of the DIV005 Creditor Trust. Related [+] (Nguyen, Quan Andy)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, December 09, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Leave of Absence Tue 12/10 4:48 PM
Notice of Leave of Absence from January 31, 2025 through February 3, 2025 and April 7, 2025 through April 11, 2025 Filed by Benjamin S. Klehr (klt) Modified on 12/11/2024 (gnh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Mon 11/25 6:18 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Quan Andy Thanh Nguyen on behalf of Todd Hennings, in his capacity as Litigation Trustee of the DIV005 Creditor Trust. Related [+] (Nguyen, Quan Andy)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
2 2 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Mon 11/25 11:47 AM
Summons Issued on Wagner Service Solutions, Inc., d/b/a Wagner Staffing. Answer Due 12/26/2024 (ggd)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/22 5:18 PM
Adversary case 24-02056 Complaint against Wagner Service Solutions, Inc., d/b/a Wagner Staffing , 12 Related [+] 13 72 (Injunctive relief - other) Filed by Todd Hennings (Klehr, Benjamin)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer