Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:22-bk-10783
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Dec 30, 2022

Debtor
Just One Dime Coaching, LLC, Debtor
8516 Anderson Mill Rd Ste 200
Austin, TX 78729-4705
Represented By
Ronald J. Sommers
Nathan Sommers Jacobs, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Randolph N Osherow
342 W Woodlawn, Suite 100
San Antonio, TX 78212


Docket last updated: 11/24/2022 12:02 AM CST
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Wed 11/23 3:19 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 22-10783 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A23336067 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 35 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Wed 11/23 3:16 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Just One Dime Coaching, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 11/30/2022 (Sommers, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule F & Mailing Matrix
Att: 2 Exhibit Schedule A/B Exhibits
Att: 3 Exhibit SOFA Exhibits
2 2 1 pgs court 341 Meeting 7 (Business No Asset) Wed 11/23 3:21 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Osherow, Randolph N added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/30/2022 at 11:00 AM at Via Phone: (877)937-4915; Code: 7491951#. (Sommers, Ronald)
Related: [-]