New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Philip Bentley
Case #: 1:22-bk-11582
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Oct 15, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Golden Seahorse LLC
99-103 Washington Street
New York, NY 10006
Represented By
Rocco A. Cavaliere
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Ning Ye
Law Office Of Ning Ye, Esq.
contact info
Bruce Weiner
Rosenberg, Musso & Weiner, LLP
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 10, 2024 12:26 PM EST
Creditor
AmTrust North America, Inc. on behalf of Wesco Insurance Company
23611 Chagrin Blvd. Suite 207
Beachwood, OH 44122
Represented By
Alan C. Hochheiser
Maurice Wutscher LLP
contact info
Creditor
FiDi Claims, LLC
Represented By
Gary F. Eisenberg
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Creditor
H.I. Wallstreet Hotel Investors, LLC
Represented By
Stephen B. Ravin
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Steven R. Schoenfeld
Denlea & Carton LLP
contact info
Creditor
Holiday Hospitality Franchising, Inc.
333 S. Hope Street, 16th Fl
Los Angeles, CA 90071
Represented By
William Hao
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Leib M. Lerner
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Creditor
NYS Department of Taxation & Finance
15 MetroTech Center
Brooklyn, NY 11201
Represented By
Jeffrey K. Cymbler
Ny State Department Taxation & Finance
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter PC c/o Shawn M. Christianson 425 Market St., Suite 2900
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Amish R. Doshi
Doshi Legal Group, P.C.
contact info
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Creditor
W&D Consultants Corp
Represented By
Bruce Weiner
Rosenberg, Musso & Weiner, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Yanhong Wang
103 Washington Street
New York, NY 10006
Represented By
Ning Ye
Law Office Of Ning Ye, Esq.
contact info
Gregory Stuart Smith
Law Offices Of Gregory S. Smith
contact info
Kirby Todd Phillips
Hartsell & Williams, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the Registered Holders of Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2018-C6, Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018
Represented By
Gary F. Eisenberg
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Hailey Ann Varner
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Brian Audette
Brian A. Audette
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Shannon Anne Scott
Doj-Ust
contact info
Unknown
Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court

GPO Mar 10 2023
Modified Post-Trial Bench Ruling on Debtor's Motion for Approval of Agreement with New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation signed on 3/10/2023 (related document(s)54) (White, Greg)
GPO Jul 31 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order Concerning whether Reinstatement of Accelerated Debt Under Bankruptcy Code § 1124(2) Requires Payment of Default Rate Interest signed on 7/31/2023 (White, Greg)
GPO Aug 02 2023
Memorandum Decision and Order Concerning whether Reinstatement of Accelerated Debt Under Bankruptcy Code § 1124(2) Requires Payment of Default Rate Interest signed on 7/31/2023 (White, Greg)

Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
571 571 answer Statement Thu 05/01 9:57 AM
Statement Hysendal USA, LLC's Statement with Respect to Wilmington Trust's Section 1127 Motion to Modify Confirmed Plan Related [+] filed by Scott S. Markowitz on behalf of Hysendal USA, LLC. with hearing to be held on 5/13/2025 (check with court for location) (Markowitz, Scott)
Related: [-] 561
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
570 570 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Tue 04/29 2:40 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Gary F. Eisenberg on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the Registered Holders of Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2018-C6, Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018.(Eisenberg, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Addendum to Post-Confirmation Report