Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-11582

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Philip Bentley
Case #: 1:24-ap-04011
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 31, 2024 1:26 PM EST
Defendant
Yanhong Wang
103 Washington Street
New York, NY 10006
Represented By
Ning Ye
Law Office Of Ning Ye, Esq.
contact info
Gregory Stuart Smith
Law Offices Of Gregory S. Smith
contact info
Yanhong Wang
contact info
Defendant
Zixin Xie
103 Washington Street
New York, NY 10006
Represented By
Zixin Xie
contact info
Gregory Stuart Smith
Law Offices Of Gregory S. Smith
contact info
Plaintiff
Golden Seahorse LLC
99-103 Washington Street
New York, NY 10006
Represented By
Scott S. Markowitz
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Gary F. Eisenberg
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
98 98 order So Ordered Stipulation Fri 04/18 12:01 PM
So Ordered Stipulation Amending Stipulation of Settlement Regarding Adversary Proceeding signed on 4/18/2025 Related [+] (White, Greg)
Related: [-] 89
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
97 97 misc Stipulation Wed 04/16 4:29 PM
Stipulation Amending Stipulation of Settlement Regarding Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Filed by Gary F. Eisenberg on behalf of Golden Seahorse LLC. (Eisenberg, Gary)
Related: [-] 89