Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:22-bk-10886

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erik P Kimball
Case #: 9:22-ap-01439
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Panagiotis Kechagias
10310 Boca Woods Ln
Boca Raton, FL 33428
Represented By
Panagiotis Kechagias
contact info
Plaintiff
Diesel Direct, LLC
777 South Flagler Drive
West Palm Beach, FL 33401
Represented By
Heather L. Ries, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
93 93 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Tue 05/20 7:56 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Heather L. Ries Esq. Related [+]. (Ries, Heather)
Related: [-] 89 Order Setting Pre-Trial/Trial
Monday, May 19, 2025
92 92 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 05/19 3:16 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Patrick R Dorsey Related [+]. (Dorsey, Patrick)
Related: [-] 91 Order on Motion to Extend Time
91 91 order Extend Time Order Mon 05/19 2:52 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Deadline To Notice Plantiff Of Information From Which Summaries Have Been Compiled Related [+] (Tate, Racquel)
Related: [-] # 86
Sunday, May 18, 2025
90 90 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 05/19 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 89 Order Setting Adversary Proceeding for Trial (Re: 11 Amended Complaint). Trial set for 09/03/2025, 09/04/2025, 09/05/2025 at 09:30 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Adam, Lorraine)
Friday, May 16, 2025
89 89 2 pgs order Order Setting Pre-Trial/Trial Fri 05/16 3:16 PM
Order Setting Adversary Proceeding for Trial Related [+]. Trial set for 09/03/2025, 09/04/2025, 09/05/2025 at 09:30 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-] 11 Amended Complaint
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
88 88 motion Extend Time Tue 05/13 5:53 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Extend Rule 26 Disclosure and Joint Stipulation Deadlines Filed by Defendant Panagiotis Kechagias (Dorsey, Patrick)
Related: [-]