Variscite NY One, Inc. v. State of New York
Original Case: 1:22-cv-01013
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-03128 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 12, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 15, 2022 3:32 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellant
State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
New York State Office of Cannabis Management
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Christopher Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Variscite NY One, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/28/2023 1:55 AM EST |
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Christopher Alexander, New York State Office of Cannabis Management and State of New York, FILED. [3436971] 22-3128 [Entered: 12/14/2022 03:32 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 29 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 11/10/2022, RECEIVED.[3436980] 22-3128 [Entered: 12/14/2022 03:38 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Christopher Alexander, New York State Office of Cannabis Management and State of New York, district court receipt # ANYNDC-6125531, FILED.[3436981] 22-3128 [Entered: 12/14/2022 03:39 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3436982] 22-3128 [Entered: 12/14/2022 03:39 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |