Sullivan v. Netsuite, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:21-bk-30037
Lead BK case is: 3:21-bk-30037
Minnesota Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | William J Fisher |
Case #: | 3:22-ap-03055 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Netsuite, Inc.
2300 Oracle Way
Austin, TX 78741 |
|
Plaintiff
Patti Sullivan
1595 Selby Avenue Suite 205
St. Paul, MN 55104 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
utility
MNB Disposition of adversary
Thu 06/01 9:18 AM
Disposition of adversary 3:22-ap-3055. Disposition: Dismissed. (Kristin MNBS) |
||
court
MNB Close adversary case
Thu 06/01 9:21 AM
Adversary case 3:22-ap-3055 closed (Kristin MNBS) |
||
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
MNB Stipulation of dismissal
Wed 05/31 2:32 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by Patti Sullivan and Buchalter, PC. Proposed order.(Manty, Nauni) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
court
MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order
Fri 03/17 1:20 PM
Minutes re:9 Order for scheduling conference. Hearing stricken as matter reported settled. (Kristin MNBS) |
||
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
MNB Order for scheduling conference
Thu 03/09 12:48 PM
Order for telephonic scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/20/2023 at 11:00 AM at *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (St Paul). (Kristin MNBS) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 01/19 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 01/19/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
MNB Order (Generic)
Fri 01/13 5:52 PM
Order extending deadline to file answer. Deadline 2/17/23. Re: (Kristin MNBS) |
|
6 | 6
misc
MNB Stipulation or agreement
Fri 01/13 3:10 PM
Stipulation filed by Patti Sullivan and Netsuite, Inc., a/d/a Oracle Netsuite. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: extension of time to file answer(Manty, Nauni) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Thursday, December 22, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
misc
MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice
Thu 12/22 2:14 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Patti Sullivan and Patti J. Sullivan.. (Sullivan, Patti) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
court
MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto)
Wed 12/21 6:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AS. Receipt Number 211143. (admin) |
|
3 | 3
misc
MNB Certificate of service
Wed 12/21 9:12 AM
Certificate of service filed by Patti Sullivan.(Manty, Nauni) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
court
MNB Summons for adversary proceeding
Mon 12/19 2:30 PM
Summons issued on Netsuite, Inc. Date Issued 12/19/2022, Answer Due 1/18/2023 (Kristin MNBS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
MNB Complaint (fee)
Mon 12/19 11:31 AM
Adversary case 22-03055 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Patti Sullivan against Netsuite, Inc. Oracle Netsuite. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 (Manty, Nauni) |