Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:22-bk-51226

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Alan M Koschik
Case #: 5:23-ap-05002
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2023
Terminated:Apr 24, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Patterson's Diesel, Inc.
6557 Buchanan Trail East
Waynesboro, PA 17286
Represented By
Patterson's Diesel, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa M. Macejko
PO Box 266
Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44222
Represented By
Michael J. Moran
Gibson & Moran
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Monday, April 24, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/24 10:03 AM
Adversary Case 5:23-ap-5002 Closed (jwand)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 02, 2023
13 13 BNC Notice of Order of Default Judgment Mon 04/03 12:12 AM
Notice of Order of Default Judgment w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/02/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, March 31, 2023
12 12 order Default Judgment Fri 03/31 3:43 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] Signed on 3/31/2023. (spete crt)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, March 02, 2023
11 11 motion Default Judgment Thu 03/02 10:57 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Melissa M. Macejko (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
10 10 BNC Clerks Entry of Default Fri 02/24 12:13 AM
Clerks Entry of Default w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
9 9 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 02/21 11:24 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Upon Patterson's Diesel, Inc. Related [+] (jwand)
Related: [-] 7 Application for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Melissa M. Macejko,8 Memorandum in Support of filed by Attorney Michael J Moran
Monday, February 20, 2023
8 8 2 pgs misc Memorandum in Support of Mon 02/20 1:56 PM
Memorandum in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by Michael J Moran Related [+]. (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 misc Application for Entry of Default Mon 02/20 1:54 PM
Application for Entry of Default Filed by Melissa M. Macejko. (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
court Hearing Held - CHAP ADI Thu 02/16 8:54 AM
Pretrial Hearing Held--clerk's entry of default and motion for default to be filed Related [+] (mk)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Melissa M. Macejko
Saturday, January 07, 2023
6 6 BNC Notice of Order on Pre-Trial Sun 01/08 12:09 AM
Notice of Order on Pre-Trial w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, January 05, 2023
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 01/05 10:32 AM
Summons Service Executed on Patterson's Diesel, Inc. 1/5/2023 (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Relative to Pre-Trial (PDF) Thu 01/05 10:11 AM
Order Relative to Initial Telephonic Pre-Trial Signed on 1/5/2023 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 2/15/2023 at 02:00 PM (Parties must notify Chambers at 330.252.6130(by noon of the day prior) of the number at which they can be reached.) (mknot crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 01/05 9:42 AM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Patterson's Diesel, Inc. Answer due 2/8/2023. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Related [+] Initial telephonic Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2023 at 02:00 PM (Parties must notify Chambers at 330.252.6130(by noon of the day prior) of the number at which they can be reached.) (mknot)
Related: [-] 2 Hearing Set
2 2 court Hearing Set Thu 01/05 9:39 AM
Initial telephonic pretrial set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2023 at 02:00 PM (Parties must notify Chambers at 330.252.6130(by noon of the day prior) of the number at which they can be reached.) (mknot)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Melissa M. Macejko
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/04 1:05 PM
Adversary case 23-05002 Complaint by Melissa M. Macejko against Patterson's Diesel, Inc.. Fee Amount $0 Nature of Suit:21 (Validity, Priority or Extent of Lien or Other Interest in Property; Rule 7001(2)) (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-]