Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Alan M Koschik
Case #: 5:22-bk-51226
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Dec 12, 2022

Debtor
Thrifty Propane Inc.
PO Box 2018
Medina, OH 44258-2018
Represented By
Anthony J. DeGirolamo
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Harold A. Corzin
304 N Cleveland-Massillon Road Commonwealth Square
Akron, OH 44333


Docket last updated: 10/18/2022 12:01 AM EDT
Monday, October 17, 2022
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 10/17 2:30 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) ([LINK 22-51226 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A45622246. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 10/17 2:11 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Thrifty Propane Inc. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Equity Security Holders Mon 10/17 2:13 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summary Assets and Liabilities Mon 10/17 2:14 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Schedule A/B Mon 10/17 2:15 PM
Schedule A/B: Property for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedule D Mon 10/17 2:16 PM
Schedule D: Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Schedule E/F Mon 10/17 2:18 PM
Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Schedule G Mon 10/17 2:18 PM
Schedule G: Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Schedule H Mon 10/17 2:19 PM
Schedule H: Non-Individual- Codebtors Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Document Mon 10/17 2:21 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty) Modified on 10/17/2022 (jwand)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Mon 10/17 2:21 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Document Mon 10/17 2:22 PM
Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty) Modified on 10/17/2022 (jwand)
Related: [-]
12 12 court Document Mon 10/17 2:23 PM
Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty) Modified on 10/17/2022 (jwand)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Mon 10/17 2:23 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Support Document Mon 10/17 2:25 PM
Support Document Exhibits to Petition, Schedules, & Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc. Related [+]. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7),4 Schedule A/B: Property,10 Statement of Financial Affairs
15 15 court Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Mon 10/17 2:27 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 10/17 2:29 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Corporate Resolution Mon 10/17 2:29 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Thrifty Propane Inc.. (DeGirolamo, Anthony aty)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Mon 10/17 2:31 PM
341(a) Meeting of Creditors to be held on 12/12/2022 at 09:00 AM at remotely. Check case docket for procedures. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]