Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 5:14-bk-50687
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Nov 06, 2014
Terminated:Mar 29, 2022
Plan Confirmed:May 24, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Mid-Continent University, Inc.
99 E Powell Rd
Mayfield, KY 42066-9007
Represented By
Mark C. Whitlow
Whitlow, Roberts, Houston & Straub, PLLC
contact info
Nicholas M Holland
contact info
Michael B. Goldstein
contact info
Last checked: never
US Trustee
Asst. U.S.Trustee
Office of the U.S.Trustee 601 West Broadway #512
Louisville, KY 40202
Represented By
John R. Stonitsch
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info
US Trustee
Charles R. Merrill
Asst. U.S.Trustee 601 West Broadway #512
Louisville, KY 40202
Represented By
Scott J. Goldberg
contact info
John R. Stonitsch
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info


1. Lexington, KY local and state news by the Lexington Herald-Leader (kentucky.com)
Submitted Mon 02/02/2015
2. Mid-Continent University Files for Bankruptcy Protection (universityherald.com)
Submitted Mon 10/13/2014
3. The possible benefits of bankruptcy for Mid-Continent University (wpsdlocal6.com)
Submitted Wed 10/08/2014
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
508 508 court Final Decree and Close Case Tue 03/29 2:43 PM
Final Decree, discharging trustee, if applicable, and canceling bond. CASE CLOSED. (MSP)
Related: [-]
507 507 order Final Decree Tue 03/29 2:42 PM
Order Granting Motion for Final Decree Related [+] Entered on 3/29/2022. (MSP)
Related: [-] 496
Monday, March 28, 2022
506 506 misc Proposed Order Mon 03/28 1:57 PM
Proposed Order RE: Revised Proposed Order Related [+]. Filed by Mid-Continent University, Inc. (Holland, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 496 Motion for Final Decree filed by Debtor Mid-Continent University, Inc.