Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:14-bk-50687

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas H Fulton
Case #: 5:15-ap-05026
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2015
Terminated:Apr 13, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Douglas Keith Roach
131 Bel Aire Drive
Mayfield, KY 42066
Represented By
Douglas Keith Roach
contact info
Defendant
Sonia Yewell
3104 North Avenue
Metropolis, IL 62960
Represented By
Sonia Yewell
contact info
Defendant
Raymond Carroll
171 Elm Street
Dyer, TN 38330
Represented By
Raymond Carroll
contact info
Defendant
Paul Melvin II
1806 Bridge
Marion, IL 62959
Represented By
Paul Melvin II
contact info
Defendant
Robert Werner
11719 Nansemond Place, Apartment C
Louisville, KY 40245
Represented By
Robert Werner
contact info
Defendant
Chadwick Davidson
155 Hillington Drive
Paducah, KY 42001
Represented By
Chadwick Davidson
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Taylor
275 Stiles Road
Paducah, KY 42003
Represented By
Thomas Taylor
contact info
Defendant
Cathy Richard
211 Parker Street
Mayfield, KY 42066
Represented By
Cathy Richard
contact info
Defendant
Jerry Muniz
Represented By
Jerry Muniz
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Pierce
2825 Lexington Road, Sbts 216
Louisville, KY 40280
Represented By
Matthew Pierce
contact info
Defendant
Tassi Brinkley
2120 Alton Road
Wingo, KY 42088
Represented By
Tassi Brinkley
contact info
Defendant
Jason Willoughby
6910 Cairo Road
Paducah, KY 42001
Represented By
Jason Willoughby
contact info
Defendant
Edward Hogg
6655 Juniper Road
Newburgh, IN 47630
Represented By
Edward Hogg
contact info
Defendant
Michael Baker
202 Golf Cart Drive
Mayfield, KY 42066
Represented By
Michael Baker
contact info
Defendant
Nathaniel Bazzell
643 Cavett Road
Kirksey, KY 42054
Represented By
Nathaniel Bazzell
contact info
Defendant
Roger Tucker
4014 South First
Louisville, KY 40214
Represented By
Roger Tucker
contact info
Defendant
David Williams
5051 Jewell Lane
Paducah, KY 42001
Represented By
David Williams
contact info
Defendant
Franklin Lewis Jr.
2786 State Route 301
Mayfield, KY 42066
Represented By
Franklin Lewis Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Sharon Inman
P.O. Box 814
Benton, KY 42025
Represented By
Sharon Inman
contact info
Defendant
Katie Dachs
1014 Ballard Road
Mayfield, KY 42066
Represented By
Katie Dachs
contact info
Defendant
William Ward
4100 Sunset Avenue
Paducah, KY 42001
Represented By
William Ward
contact info
Defendant
Jodi McKnight
Represented By
Jodi McKnight
contact info
Defendant
Charles Nichols
9700 Marceitta Way
Louisville, KY 40291
Represented By
Charles Nichols
contact info
Defendant
Wanda Gibson
2017 Washington Street
Paducah, KY 42003
Represented By
Wanda Gibson
contact info
Defendant
Paul Thompson
317 State Route 339 South
Fancy Farm, KY 42039
Represented By
Paul Thompson
contact info
Defendant
Kelli Heinz
P.O. Box 1735
Murray, KY 42071
Represented By
Kelli Heinz
contact info
Defendant
Jamie Summerville
6673 County Road 437
Hannibal, MO 63401
Represented By
Jamie Summerville
contact info
Defendant
Edwin Nyamwala
2 South Heathrow Drive
Rome, GA 30165
Represented By
Edwin Nyamwala
contact info
Defendant
Barbara Pieront
Represented By
Barbara Pieront
contact info
Defendant
Stephen Wilson
100 Circle Drive
Paducah, KY 42003
Represented By
Stephen Wilson
contact info
Plaintiff
Mid-Continent University, Inc.
99 Powell Road East
Mayfield, KY 42066
Represented By
Mark C. Whitlow
Whitlow, Roberts, Houston & Straub, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 13, 2016
court Close Case -AP Wed 04/13 6:59 AM
Case Closed. (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2016
48 48 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Fri 04/01 1:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 03/31/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 47 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Related Doc46 ) Entered on 3/29/2016.
Tuesday, March 29, 2016
47 47 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/29 2:19 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Entered on 3/29/2016. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 46
Monday, March 28, 2016
46 46 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/28 5:07 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Plaintiff Mid-Continent University, Inc. (Holland, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Dismissing Case
Thursday, March 24, 2016
utility File Document Thu 03/24 11:33 AM
Pre-trial conference held on March 23, 2016. Mark Whitlow to File Motion to Dismiss1 Adversary case 15-05026 Complaint by Mark C. Whitlow on behalf of Mid-Continent University, Inc. against Stephen Wilson, Barbara Pieront, Edwin Nyamwala, Jamie Summerville, Kelli Heinz, Paul Thompson, Wanda Gibson, Charles Nichols, Jodi McKnight, William Ward, Katie Dachs, Sharon Inman, Franklin Lewis Jr., David Williams, Douglas Keith Roach, Roger Tucker, Nathaniel Bazzell, Michael Baker, Edward Hogg, Jason Willoughby, Tassi Brinkley, Matthew Pierce, Jerry Muniz, Cathy Richard, Thomas Taylor, Chadwick Davidson, Robert Werner, Paul Melvin II, Raymond Carroll, Sonia Yewell filed by Plaintiff Mid-Continent University, Inc.). Document due by 4/14/2016. (Gudgel, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
45 45 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/02 8:27 AM
Answer to Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Defendants Michael Baker, Nathaniel Bazzell, Tassi Brinkley, Raymond Carroll, Katie Dachs, Chadwick Davidson, Wanda Gibson, Kelli Heinz, Edward Hogg, Sharon Inman, Franklin Lewis Jr., Jodi McKnight, Paul Melvin II, Jerry Muniz, Charles Nichols, Edwin Nyamwala, Matthew Pierce, Barbara Pieront, Cathy Richard, Douglas Keith Roach, Jamie Summerville, Thomas Taylor, Paul Thompson, Roger Tucker, William Ward, Robert Werner, David Williams, Jason Willoughby, Stephen Wilson, Sonia Yewell, Plaintiff Mid-Continent University, Inc. (Perdue, Timothy). Related document(s)41 Motion For Summary Judgment Against Defendants filed by Plaintiff Mid-Continent University, Inc.. Modified on 3/2/2016 (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 27, 2016
44 44 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 02/28 1:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 02/27/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 43 Order of the Court to reschedule hearing set for February 25, 2016 regarding on Adversary case 15-05026 Complaint by Mark C. Whitlow on behalf of Mid-Continent University, Inc. against Stephen Wilson, Barbara Pieront, Edwin Nyamwala, Jamie Summerville, Kelli Heinz, Paul Thompson, Wanda Gibson, Charles Nichols, Jodi McKnight, William Ward, Katie Dachs, Sharon Inman, Franklin Lewis Jr., David Williams, Douglas Keith Roach, Roger Tucker, Nathaniel Bazzell, Michael Baker, Edward Hogg, Jason Willoughby, Tassi Brinkley, Matthew Pierce, Jerry Muniz, Cathy Richard, Thomas Taylor, Chadwick Davidson, Robert Werner, Paul Melvin II, Raymond Carroll, Sonia Yewell1 and on Motion For Summary Judgment Against Defendants . Filed by Plaintiff Mid-Continent University, Inc41 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 3/23/2016 at 09:00 AM (Central Time) at Paducah Courthouse, Federal Building, 5th & Broadway, Paducah, KY 42001. (Gudgel, A) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Thursday, February 25, 2016
43 43 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Thu 02/25 12:35 PM
Order of the Court to reschedule hearing set for February 25, 2016 regarding on Adversary case 15-05026 Complaint by Mark C. Whitlow on behalf of Mid-Continent University, Inc. against Stephen Wilson, Barbara Pieront, Edwin Nyamwala, Jamie Summerville, Kelli Heinz, Paul Thompson, Wanda Gibson, Charles Nichols, Jodi McKnight, William Ward, Katie Dachs, Sharon Inman, Franklin Lewis Jr., David Williams, Douglas Keith Roach, Roger Tucker, Nathaniel Bazzell, Michael Baker, Edward Hogg, Jason Willoughby, Tassi Brinkley, Matthew Pierce, Jerry Muniz, Cathy Richard, Thomas Taylor, Chadwick Davidson, Robert Werner, Paul Melvin II, Raymond Carroll, Sonia Yewell1 and on Motion For Summary Judgment Against Defendants . Filed by Plaintiff Mid-Continent University, Inc41 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 3/23/2016 at 09:00 AM (Central Time) at Paducah Courthouse, Federal Building, 5th & Broadway, Paducah, KY 42001. (Gudgel, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2016
42 42 notice Hearing(Document) Mon 02/22 1:39 PM
Notice of Hearing regarding Motion For Summary Judgment Against Defendants Filed by Plaintiff Mid-Continent University, Inc.41 . ANY OBJECTION TO THE MOTION HEREIN SHALL BE FILED WITH THE COURT NO LATER THAN SEVEN DAYS PRIOR TO THE DATE OF HEARING. Hearing scheduled for 3/23/2016 at 09:00 AM (Central Time) at Paducah Courthouse, Federal Building, 5th & Broadway, Paducah, KY 42001. cc: sl (Gudgel, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2016
41 41 motion Summary Judgment Fri 02/19 11:12 AM
Motion For Summary Judgment Against Defendants . Filed by Plaintiff Mid-Continent University, Inc. (Holland, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment
Saturday, January 30, 2016
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 01/31 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 01/30/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Order of the Court to continue pre-trial conference held on January 27, 2016 regarding Adversary case 15-05026 Complaint by Mark C. Whitlow on behalf of Mid-Continent University, Inc. against Stephen Wilson, Barbara Pieront, Edwin Nyamwala, Jamie Summerville, Kelli Heinz, Paul Thompson, Wanda Gibson, Charles Nichols, Jodi McKnight, William Ward, Katie Dachs, Sharon Inman, Franklin Lewis Jr., David Williams, Douglas Keith Roach, Roger Tucker, Nathaniel Bazzell, Michael Baker, Edward Hogg, Jason Willoughby, Tassi Brinkley, Matthew Pierce, Jerry Muniz, Cathy Richard, Thomas Taylor, Chadwick Davidson, Robert Werner, Paul Melvin II, Raymond Carroll, Sonia Yewell. Fee Amount $3501 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 2/25/2016 at 09:00 AM (Central Time) at Paducah Courthouse, Federal Building, 5th & Broadway, Paducah, KY 42001. (Gudgel, A) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Thursday, January 28, 2016
39 39 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Thu 01/28 11:04 AM
Order of the Court to continue pre-trial conference held on January 27, 2016 regarding Adversary case 15-05026 Complaint by Mark C. Whitlow on behalf of Mid-Continent University, Inc. against Stephen Wilson, Barbara Pieront, Edwin Nyamwala, Jamie Summerville, Kelli Heinz, Paul Thompson, Wanda Gibson, Charles Nichols, Jodi McKnight, William Ward, Katie Dachs, Sharon Inman, Franklin Lewis Jr., David Williams, Douglas Keith Roach, Roger Tucker, Nathaniel Bazzell, Michael Baker, Edward Hogg, Jason Willoughby, Tassi Brinkley, Matthew Pierce, Jerry Muniz, Cathy Richard, Thomas Taylor, Chadwick Davidson, Robert Werner, Paul Melvin II, Raymond Carroll, Sonia Yewell. Fee Amount $3501 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 2/25/2016 at 09:00 AM (Central Time) at Paducah Courthouse, Federal Building, 5th & Broadway, Paducah, KY 42001. (Gudgel, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2016
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Fri 01/22 1:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 01/21/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Order of the Court to reschedule status hearing set for January 21, 2016 regarding Adversary case 15-05026 Complaint by Mark C. Whitlow on behalf of Mid-Continent University, Inc. against Stephen Wilson, Barbara Pieront, Edwin Nyamwala, Jamie Summerville, Kelli Heinz, Paul Thompson, Wanda Gibson, Charles Nichols, Jodi McKnight, William Ward, Katie Dachs, Sharon Inman, Franklin Lewis Jr., David Williams, Douglas Keith Roach, Roger Tucker, Nathaniel Bazzell, Michael Baker, Edward Hogg, Jason Willoughby, Tassi Brinkley, Matthew Pierce, Jerry Muniz, Cathy Richard, Thomas Taylor, Chadwick Davidson, Robert Werner, Paul Melvin II, Raymond Carroll, Sonia Yewell1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Hearing scheduled for 1/27/2016 at 09:00 AM (Central Time) at Paducah Courthouse, Federal Building, 5th & Broadway, Paducah, KY 42001. (Gudgel, A) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
37 37 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Tue 01/19 12:08 PM
Order of the Court to reschedule status hearing set for January 21, 2016 regarding Adversary case 15-05026 Complaint by Mark C. Whitlow on behalf of Mid-Continent University, Inc. against Stephen Wilson, Barbara Pieront, Edwin Nyamwala, Jamie Summerville, Kelli Heinz, Paul Thompson, Wanda Gibson, Charles Nichols, Jodi McKnight, William Ward, Katie Dachs, Sharon Inman, Franklin Lewis Jr., David Williams, Douglas Keith Roach, Roger Tucker, Nathaniel Bazzell, Michael Baker, Edward Hogg, Jason Willoughby, Tassi Brinkley, Matthew Pierce, Jerry Muniz, Cathy Richard, Thomas Taylor, Chadwick Davidson, Robert Werner, Paul Melvin II, Raymond Carroll, Sonia Yewell1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Hearing scheduled for 1/27/2016 at 09:00 AM (Central Time) at Paducah Courthouse, Federal Building, 5th & Broadway, Paducah, KY 42001. (Gudgel, A)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 22, 2015
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Mon 11/23 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 11/22/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order of the Court to continue hearing held on November 19, 2015 Adversary case 15-05026 Complaint by Mark C. Whitlow on behalf of Mid-Continent University, Inc. against Stephen Wilson, Barbara Pieront, Edwin Nyamwala, Jamie Summerville, Kelli Heinz, Paul Thompson, Wanda Gibson, Charles Nichols, Jodi McKnight, William Ward, Katie Dachs, Sharon Inman, Franklin Lewis Jr., David Williams, Douglas Keith Roach, Roger Tucker, Nathaniel Bazzell, Michael Baker, Edward Hogg, Jason Willoughby, Tassi Brinkley, Matthew Pierce, Jerry Muniz, Cathy Richard, Thomas Taylor, Chadwick Davidson, Robert Werner, Paul Melvin II, Raymond Carroll, Sonia Yewell1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Status hearing to be held on 1/21/2016 at 09:00 AM (Central Time) at Paducah Courthouse, Federal Building, 5th & Broadway, Paducah, KY 42001. (Gudgel, A) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Friday, November 20, 2015
35 35 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Fri 11/20 12:22 PM
Order of the Court to continue hearing held on November 19, 2015 Adversary case 15-05026 Complaint by Mark C. Whitlow on behalf of Mid-Continent University, Inc. against Stephen Wilson, Barbara Pieront, Edwin Nyamwala, Jamie Summerville, Kelli Heinz, Paul Thompson, Wanda Gibson, Charles Nichols, Jodi McKnight, William Ward, Katie Dachs, Sharon Inman, Franklin Lewis Jr., David Williams, Douglas Keith Roach, Roger Tucker, Nathaniel Bazzell, Michael Baker, Edward Hogg, Jason Willoughby, Tassi Brinkley, Matthew Pierce, Jerry Muniz, Cathy Richard, Thomas Taylor, Chadwick Davidson, Robert Werner, Paul Melvin II, Raymond Carroll, Sonia Yewell1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Status hearing to be held on 1/21/2016 at 09:00 AM (Central Time) at Paducah Courthouse, Federal Building, 5th & Broadway, Paducah, KY 42001. (Gudgel, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2015
34 34 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/21 9:48 AM
Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint . Filed by Defendants Jerry Muniz, Charles Nichols, Edwin Nyamwala, Matthew Pierce, Barbara Pieront, Cathy Richard, Douglas Keith Roach, Jamie Summerville, Thomas Taylor, Paul Thompson, Roger Tucker, William Ward, Robert Werner, David Williams, Jason Willoughby, Stephen Wilson, Sonia Yewell (Perdue, Timothy)
Related: [-]
33 33 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/21 9:45 AM
Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint . Filed by Defendants Michael Baker, Nathaniel Bazzell, Tassi Brinkley, Raymond Carroll, Katie Dachs, Chadwick Davidson, Wanda Gibson, Kelli Heinz, Edward Hogg, Sharon Inman, Franklin Lewis Jr., Jodi McKnight, Paul Melvin II (Perdue, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2015
32 32 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:59 PM
Summons Service Executed on Kelli Heinz on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
31 31 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:58 PM
Summons Service Executed on Edward Hogg on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
30 30 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:58 PM
Summons Service Executed on Franklin Lewis Jr. on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
29 29 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:57 PM
Summons Service Executed on Sharon Inman on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
28 28 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:56 PM
Summons Service Executed on Charles Nichols on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
27 27 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:56 PM
Summons Service Executed on Paul Melvin II on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
26 26 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:55 PM
Summons Service Executed on Matthew Pierce on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
25 25 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on Edwin Nyamwala on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
24 24 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:53 PM
Summons Service Executed on Cathy Richard on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
23 23 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on Douglas Keith Roach on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
22 22 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jamie Summerville on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
21 21 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:51 PM
Summons Service Executed on Thomas Taylor on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
20 20 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:50 PM
Summons Service Executed on Paul Thompson on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
19 19 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:49 PM
Summons Service Executed on Roger Tucker on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
18 18 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on William Ward on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
17 17 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on Robert Werner on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:46 PM
Summons Service Executed on David Williams on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
15 15 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:46 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jason Willoughby on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
14 14 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:43 PM
Summons Service Executed on Stephen Wilson on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:42 PM
Summons Service Executed on Sonia Yewell on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on Barbara Pieront on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jodi McKnight on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:40 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jerry Muniz on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:39 PM
Summons Service Executed on Michael Baker on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:39 PM
Summons Service Executed on Nathaniel Bazzell on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:38 PM
Summons Service Executed on Tassi Brinkley on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:37 PM
Summons Service Executed on Raymond Carroll on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:37 PM
Summons Service Executed on Katie Dachs on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:36 PM
Summons Service Executed on Chadwick Davidson on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 4:35 PM
Summons Service Executed on Wanda Gibson on October 5, 2015. (Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Mon 10/05 7:19 AM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Michael Baker Answer Due 11/4/2015; Nathaniel Bazzell Answer Due 11/4/2015; Tassi Brinkley Answer Due 11/4/2015; Raymond Carroll Answer Due 11/4/2015; Katie Dachs Answer Due 11/4/2015; Chadwick Davidson Answer Due 11/4/2015; Wanda Gibson Answer Due 11/4/2015; Kelli Heinz Answer Due 11/4/2015; Edward Hogg Answer Due 11/4/2015; Sharon Inman Answer Due 11/4/2015; Franklin Lewis Jr. Answer Due 11/4/2015; Jodi McKnight Answer Due 11/4/2015; Paul Melvin II Answer Due 11/4/2015; Jerry Muniz Answer Due 11/4/2015; Charles Nichols Answer Due 11/4/2015; Edwin Nyamwala Answer Due 11/4/2015; Matthew Pierce Answer Due 11/4/2015; Barbara Pieront Answer Due 11/4/2015; Cathy Richard Answer Due 11/4/2015; Douglas Keith Roach Answer Due 11/4/2015; Jamie Summerville Answer Due 11/4/2015; Thomas Taylor Answer Due 11/4/2015; Paul Thompson Answer Due 11/4/2015; Roger Tucker Answer Due 11/4/2015; William Ward Answer Due 11/4/2015; Robert Werner Answer Due 11/4/2015; David Williams Answer Due 11/4/2015; Jason Willoughby Answer Due 11/4/2015; Stephen Wilson Answer Due 11/4/2015; Sonia Yewell Answer Due 11/4/2015.. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 11/19/2015 at 09:00 AM (Central Time) at Paducah Courthouse, Federal Building, 5th & Broadway, Paducah, KY 42001. (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/02 11:00 AM
Adversary case 15-05026 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) Complaint by Mark C. Whitlow on behalf of Mid-Continent University, Inc. against Stephen Wilson, Barbara Pieront, Edwin Nyamwala, Jamie Summerville, Kelli Heinz, Paul Thompson, Wanda Gibson, Charles Nichols, Jodi McKnight, William Ward, Katie Dachs, Sharon Inman, Franklin Lewis Jr., David Williams, Douglas Keith Roach, Roger Tucker, Nathaniel Bazzell, Michael Baker, Edward Hogg, Jason Willoughby, Tassi Brinkley, Matthew Pierce, Jerry Muniz, Cathy Richard, Thomas Taylor, Chadwick Davidson, Robert Werner, Paul Melvin II, Raymond Carroll, Sonia Yewell. Fee Amount $350(Whitlow, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit a - Order for Partial Summary Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Judgment Lien
crditcrd none Fri 10/02 11:01 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-05026 thf) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 7300474 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1