Shale et al v. Gissing North America LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160
Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Lisa S Gretchko |
Case #: | 2:23-ap-04012 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Gissing North America LLC
32500 Telegraph Rd. Ste. 207
Bingham Farms, MI 48025 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Shale, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Reaves, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, December 13, 2024 | ||
court
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP)
Fri 12/13 2:18 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 06/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St.. (London, Cheryl) |
||
Thursday, December 12, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Fifth Agreed Order Staying Proceeding . Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 6/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St.. (cmcl) |
|
29 | 29
![]() Joint Stipulation By and Between Mary E. Olsen and Anthony J. Miller Re: Entry of Fifth Agreed Order Staying This Proceeding . Filed by Intervenor-Defendant Kenneth Nathan Chapter 7 Trustee. (Miller, Anthony) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
court
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP)
Fri 09/13 3:58 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St.. (London, Cheryl) Note: This hearing will be conducted by telephone. At least five minutes before the scheduled time for hearing, counsel and parties should call (202) |
||
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Fourth Agreed Order Staying Proceeding . (KEC) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Stipulation By and Between Anthony J. Miller and Mary E. Olsen Re: Joint Stipulation for Entry of Fourth Agreed Order Staying This Proceeding . Filed by Intervenor-Defendant Kenneth Nathan Chapter 7 Trustee. (Miller, Anthony) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
court
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP)
Mon 08/05 9:41 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. [#24] Second Agreed Order Staying Proceeding Hearing scheduled 09/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St.. (London, Cheryl) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Third Agreed Order Staying Proceedings . Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 9/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St.. (J. Laskaska) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Stipulation By and Between Anthony J. Miller and Mary E. Olsen Re: Joint Stipulation for Entry of Third Agreed Order Staying This Proceeding . Filed by Intervenor-Defendant Kenneth Nathan Chapter 7 Trustee. (Miller, Anthony) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2024 | ||
court
Minute Entry
Fri 01/12 9:31 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned . Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 7/12/2024 at 10:00 AM (London, Cheryl) |
||
Thursday, January 11, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Second Agreed Order Staying Proceeding . Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 7/12/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St. (kcm) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Stipulation By and Between Plaintiffs Shale and Reaves and Intervening Defendant Kenneth A. Nathan, Trustee Re: Second Agreed Order Staying Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Intervenor-Defendant Kenneth Nathan Chapter 7 Trustee. (Miller, Anthony) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/15/2023 10:00:57 AM ]. File Size [ 7328 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:15:16 ]. (admin) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Stipulated Order Staying Proceeding and Adjourning Initial Scheduling Conference to January 12, 2024 . Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 1/12/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St.. (KEC) |
|
court
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP)
Mon 05/15 10:28 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Held and Adjourned. Order To Follow. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 01/12/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St.. (Ewill) |
||
court
Minute Entry. Hearing Cancelled
Mon 05/15 10:32 AM
ENTERED IN ERROR. Please disregard this entry. Minute Entry. Hearing Cancelled. (Ewill) Modified on 5/15/2023 (adeld) |
||
court
Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual)
Mon 05/15 2:18 PM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 5/15/23 by the United States Postal Service to Gissing North America LLC at 32500 Telegraph Rd. Ste. 207 Bingham Farms, MI 48025. (KEC) |
||
Sunday, May 14, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Stipulation By and Between Plaintiffs Shale and Reaves and Intervening Defendant Kenneth A. Nathan, Trustee Re: Agreed Order Staying Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Intervenor-Defendant Kenneth Nathan Chapter 7 Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/5/2023 11:06:57 AM ]. File Size [ 23048 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:48:01 ]. (admin) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Amended Answer to Complaint and Amended Affirmative Defenses Filed by Kenneth Nathan Chapter 7 Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey) |
|
court
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP)
Fri 05/05 3:48 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Held and Adjourned. Hearing scheduled 05/15/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St.. (London, Cheryl) Note: This initial scheduling conference, as directed by this Court will be held by telephone. At least five minutes before the scheduled time for hearing, counsel and parties should call (888) |
||
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/1/2023 10:43:38 AM ]. File Size [ 26784 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:55:48 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP)
Mon 05/01 10:17 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Held and Adjourned. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/05/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St.. (London, Cheryl) Note: Effective beginning May 2, 2022, and continuing until further notice, Judge Lisa S. Gretchko is conducting all initial scheduling conferences, and all hearings on orders to show cause and reaffirmation agreements or other hearings as directed by this Court, by telephone. At least five minutes before the scheduled time for hearing, counsel and parties should call (888) |
||
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Reaves, Steven Shale. (Olsen, Mary) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Corrected Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Reaves, Steven Shale. (Olsen, Mary) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Deficient Pleading: Electronic Signature Incorrect Format ECF Procedure 11 d-1. Electronic Signature due on 4/21/2023. (kcm) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Reaves, Steven Shale. (Olsen, Mary) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 5/1/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St.. (London, Cheryl) Note: Effective beginning May 2, 2022, and continuing until further notice, Judge Lisa S. Gretchko is conducting all initial scheduling conferences, and all hearings on orders to show cause and reaffirmation agreements or other hearings as directed by this Court, by telephone. At least five minutes before the scheduled time for hearing, counsel and parties should call (888) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Kenneth Nathan Chapter 7 Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Order Granting Chapter 7 Trustee Kenneth Nathan's Motion To Intervene Pursuant To Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7024 . (kcm) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Certification of Non-Response Filed by Interested Party Kenneth Nathan Chapter 7 Trustee . (Bigelman, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order Extending Time For Chapter 7 Trustee, Kenneth Nathan To Respond To The Class Action Adversary Proceeding Complaint. . (kcm) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Stipulation By and Between Jeffrey H. Bigelman and John C. Philo Re: Second Stipulation to Extend the Time for Chapter 7 Trustee, Kenneth Nathan, to Respond to the Class Action Adversary Proceeding Complaint . Filed by Interested Party Kenneth Nathan Chapter 7 Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Motion to Intervene Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7024 Filed by Interested Party Kenneth Nathan Chapter 7 Trustee (Bigelman, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order Extending Time For Chapter 7 Trustee, Kenneth Nathan To Respond To The Class Action Adversary Proceeding Complaint. . (kcm) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Stipulation By and Between Jeffery H. Bigelman and John C. Philo Re: to Extend Time for Chapter 7 Trustee, Kenneth Nathan to Respond to the Class Action Adversary Proceeding Complaint . Filed by Trustee Kenneth Nathan Chapter 7 Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Service Executed on Gissing North America LLC 1/9/2023 (Philo, John) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Gissing North America LLC Answer Due 02/6/2023 (Philo, John) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 23-04012 (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))): Complaint by Steven Shale, Ryan Reaves against Gissing North America LLC. Fee Amount $350. (Philo, John) |