Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Sharon Johnson Coleman
Case #: 1:12-cv-10058
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2012
Terminated:Sep 04, 2015
Last checked: Sunday Jun 12, 2016 10:30 PM CDT
Counter Claimant
Kastalon Polyurethane Products
Represented By
William James Rogers
Thomson, Rhodes & Cowie
contact info
Christopher J. Novak
Goldstine Skrodzki Russian Nemec And Hoff Ltd
contact info
Richard John Nogal
Goldstine, Skrodzki, Russian, Nemec & Hoff, Ltd.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Kastalon, Inc
Represented By
William James Rogers
Thomson, Rhodes & Cowie
contact info
Christopher J. Novak
Goldstine Skrodzki Russian Nemec And Hoff Ltd
contact info
Richard John Nogal
Goldstine, Skrodzki, Russian, Nemec & Hoff, Ltd.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Toll Processing Services, LLC
Represented By
Leonard Fornella
Babst Calland Clements & Zomnir, P.C.
contact info
Alana Elizabeth Fortna
Babst, Calland, Clements & Zomnir, P.C.
contact info
Albert L. Chollet, III
Watt, Tieder, Hoffar & Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kastalon Polyurethane Products
Represented By
William James Rogers
Thomson, Rhodes & Cowie
contact info
Christopher J. Novak
Goldstine Skrodzki Russian Nemec And Hoff Ltd
contact info
Richard John Nogal
Goldstine, Skrodzki, Russian, Nemec & Hoff, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Kastalon, Inc
Represented By
William James Rogers
Thomson, Rhodes & Cowie
contact info
Christopher J. Novak
Goldstine Skrodzki Russian Nemec And Hoff Ltd
contact info
Richard John Nogal
Goldstine, Skrodzki, Russian, Nemec & Hoff, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Toll Processing Services, LLC
Represented By
Leonard Fornella
Babst Calland Clements & Zomnir, P.C.
contact info
Alana Elizabeth Fortna
Babst, Calland, Clements & Zomnir, P.C.
contact info
Albert L. Chollet, III
Watt, Tieder, Hoffar & Fitzgerald LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 17 2012
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION on the 6 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by KASTALON, INC, KASTALON POLYURETHANE PRODUCTS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 12/17/2012. (jmb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 12/18/2012.]
GPO Apr 08 2014
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/8/2014:Mailed notice(rth, )
GPO Sep 04 2015
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Based on the foregoing, this Court grants summary judgment in favor of Kastalon on all three counts of the complaint 90 and denies summary judgment in favor of Toll Processing 84. Civil case terminated. (For further details see order) Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/4/2015. Mailed notice(air, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.