Original Case: 1:12-cv-10058

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cv-03187
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2015
Terminated:Jan 23, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 24, 2018 2:31 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
KASTALON, INC.
Represented By
Richard J. Nogal
GOLDSTINE, SKRODZKI, RUSSIAN, NEMEC & HOFF
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KASTALON POLYURETHANE PRODUCTS
Represented By
Richard J. Nogal
GOLDSTINE, SKRODZKI, RUSSIAN, NEMEC & HOFF
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
TOLL PROCESSING SERVICES, LLC
Represented By
Leonard Fornella
BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS & ZOMNIR, P.C.
contact info
Alana Elizabeth Fortna
BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS & ZOMNIR, P.C.
contact info

GPO Jan 23 2018
Filed opinion of the court by Judge Pepper. We reverse the district courtā??s grant of summary judgment in favor of Kastalon on Toll Processingā??s conversion claim, reverse the grant of summary judgment in favor of Kastalon on the negligence claim, and affirm the district courtā??s grant of summary judgment as to Toll Processingā??s breach of contract claim. We remand to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this decision. Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge; Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge and Pamela Pepper, District Court Judge. [6898418-1] [6898418] [15-3187]

Docket last updated: 01/24/2018 2:30 AM CST
Thursday, October 01, 2015
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 10/15/2015. Appellant's brief due on or before 11/10/2015 for Toll Processing Services, LLC. [1] [6696945] 15-3187 (MM)
Related: [-]