LTL Management LLC v. Emory et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:21-bk-30589
Lead BK case is: 3:21-bk-30589
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael B Kaplan |
Case #: | 3:23-ap-01022 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Theresa Swain Emory
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Lawrence Kradin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Coulter Maddox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LTL Management LLC
501 George Street
New Brunswick, NJ 08933 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Mon 05/22 10:43 AM
Minute of 5/22/23; OUTCOME: MOOT - Case Closed (km) |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Fri 04/07 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/06/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
To Close Case
Tue 04/04 3:12 PM
Order to Close Case (Case Number: 3:2023-ap-1022-MBK). Reason: Closed consistent with the Courts Order Dismissing the Debtors Chapter 11 Case entered in the Main Case, 21-30589 . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. Signed on 4/4/2023. (wiq) |
|
utility
Close Adversary Case
Tue 04/04 3:43 PM
Adversary Case (3:23-ap-1022) Closed. (wiq) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
court
Hearing Rescheduled (Document)
Thu 03/23 1:48 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 3/23/2023 Hearing scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq) |
||
Monday, February 20, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
claims
Affidavit of Service
Mon 02/20 5:59 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC . (Garabato, Sid) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sat 02/18 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/17/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
claims
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/15 6:46 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC . (Garabato, Sid) |
|
13 | 13
order
Consent Order
Wed 02/15 2:58 PM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING OF DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT, . Filed by Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of LTL Management LLC . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. Signed on 2/15/2023. (wiq) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Agenda
Mon 02/13 8:21 PM
Notice of Agenda filed by Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of LTL Management LLC. (DeFilippo, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Wed 02/01 4:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Ross J. Switkes on behalf of Theresa Swain Emory, Richard Lawrence Kradin, John Coulter Maddox. (Switkes, Ross) |
|
10 | 10
2
pgs
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Wed 02/01 4:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Bruce S. Luckman on behalf of Theresa Swain Emory, Richard Lawrence Kradin, John Coulter Maddox. (Luckman, Bruce) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Wed 02/01 4:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Arthur Abramowitz on behalf of Theresa Swain Emory, Richard Lawrence Kradin, John Coulter Maddox. (Abramowitz, Arthur) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
claims
Affidavit of Service
Mon 01/23 3:37 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC . (Garabato, Sid) |
|
7 | 7
claims
Affidavit of Service
Mon 01/23 3:03 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC . (Garabato, Sid) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
court
Summons Issued
Thu 01/19 4:35 PM
Summons Issued to LTL Management LLC for Service on Theresa Swain Emory Answer due on 2/21/2023; Richard Lawrence Kradin Answer due on 2/21/2023; John Coulter Maddox Answer due on 2/21/2023 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 3/23/2023 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wdr) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Attachments | ||
5 | 5
claims
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 01/19 1:26 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice.. (Tretter, Lyndon) |
|
4 | 4
claims
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 01/19 1:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice.. (Pacelli, Joseph) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 01/19 1:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by James N. Lawlor on behalf of LTL Management LLC. (Lawlor, James) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 01/19 12:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Allison Meghan Brown on behalf of LTL Management LLC. (Brown, Allison) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
40
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/18 6:37 PM
Adversary case 23-01022 Complaint by LTL Management LLC against Theresa Swain Emory ; Richard Lawrence Kradin ; John Coulter Maddox. Fee Amount $ 350.. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (DeFilippo, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M |