Member Case
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-10063

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 1:23-bk-10064
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Genesis Global Capital, LLC
250 Park Ave S
New York, NY 10003-1402
Represented By
Sean A. O'Neal
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Monday, January 30, 2023
5 5 claims Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY) Mon 01/30 9:56 AM
Transfer Agreement FRBP. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Cryptocurrency Management LLC (Amount $4,000,000.00) To Jefferies Leveraged Credit Products, LLC filed by Allison Dawn Weissman on behalf of Jefferies Leveraged Credit Products, LLC. (Weissman, Allison)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 01/30 9:57 AM
Receipt of Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY)([LINK 23-10064 shl] ) [claims,transclm] ( 26.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16072684. Fee amount 26.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #5
Thursday, January 26, 2023
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Thu 01/26 11:50 AM
Case Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 Cases commenced by Genesis Global Holdco, LLC. The docket in Case No. 23-10063 should be consulted for all matters affecting the above listed cases . (Cappiello, Karen)
Related: [-]
misc Add Claims and Noticing Agent Thu 01/26 12:48 PM
Claims and Noticing Agent Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC added to the case. (Cappiello, Karen)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 22, 2023
4 4 notice Notice, Appearance Sun 01/22 5:34 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Pleadings filed by Jeremy R. Johnson on behalf of Caramila Capital Management LLC. (Johnson, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
3 3 misc Amended Voluntary Petition Fri 01/20 5:57 PM
Amended Voluntary Petition Filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (O'Neal, Sean)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Motion, Joint Administration Fri 01/20 12:37 AM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (O'Neal, Sean)
Related: [-]
misc Add Judge Fri 01/20 7:58 AM
Judge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
1 1 15 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 01/19 11:13 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Case Designated As Mega as per LBR 1073-1. Filed by Sean A. O'Neal of Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton, LLP on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (O'Neal, Sean)
Related: [-]