California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:23-cv-00446
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2023
Terminated:Dec 06, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jul 20, 2023 2:13 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
The Ergo Baby Carrier Inc.
Represented By
Luke M. Meriwether
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Travis W. McCallon
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Timothy J. Hadachek
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Ronald A. Valenzuela
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
BabyBjorn AB
Represented By
Elliot J Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Jessica Megan Leano
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Faisal M Zubairi
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Ergo Baby Carrier Inc.
Represented By
Luke M. Meriwether
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Travis W. McCallon
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Timothy J. Hadachek
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Ronald A. Valenzuela
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BabyBjorn AB
Represented By
Elliot J Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Jessica Megan Leano
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Faisal M Zubairi
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
208 208 order Attorney Fees Mon 05/12 1:15 PM
[In Chambers] Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Nontaxable Costs (Dkt. No.192 ) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: Finding this matter suitable for resolution without oral argument, the Court VACATED the hearing set for March 21, 2025. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15. For the following reasons, the Court DENIES Defendant's Motion. See Order for further information. (es)
Related: [-]