Original Case: 2:23-cv-00446

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvpri-01457
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2025 4:18 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
THE ERGO BABY CARRIER INC.
Represented By
Luke Meriwether
Lathrop GPM LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BABYBJORN AB
Represented By
Elliot Hales
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/19/2025 3:15 AM EST
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 02/14/2025. [1069866] Entry of Appearance is due on 03/04/2025. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/04/2025. Docketing Statement is due on 03/04/2025. Appellant's brief is due on 04/21/2025. [JSP] [Entered: 02/18/2025 04:36 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 45 pgs Civil Case Docketed