Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12744

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:23-ap-01019
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2023
Terminated:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
MountainSky Landscaping LLC
4467 Clay Street
Boulder, CO 80301
Represented By
MountainSky Landscaping LLC
contact info
Defendant
Peter Scott Churchill
4467 Clay Street
Boulder, CO 80301
Represented By
Peter Scott Churchill
contact info
Defendant
Shiloh Staedler Churchill
4467 Clay Street
Boulder, CO 80301
Represented By
Shiloh Staedler Churchill
contact info
Defendant
Luca Staedler Churchill
4467 Clay Street
Boulder, CO 80301
Represented By
Luca Staedler Churchill
contact info
Plaintiff
Valerie Jones
Represented By
Bailey C. Pompea
Hackstaff Snow Atkinson & Griess, LLC
contact info
J. Aaron Atkinson
Hackstaff Snow Atkinson & Griess, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory Jones
Represented By
Bailey C. Pompea
Hackstaff Snow Atkinson & Griess, LLC
contact info
J. Aaron Atkinson
Hackstaff Snow Atkinson & Griess, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Monday, November 25, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/25 9:13 AM
Adversary Case Number 23-01019 KHT Closed. (td)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
20 20 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 11/08 12:29 PM
Order Regarding Stipulated Dismissal Of Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (dd)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,19 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 11/08 12:30 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 23-01019 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 11/22/2024. (dd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
19 19 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 11/07 12:50 PM
Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of Luca Staedler Churchill, Peter Scott Churchill, Shiloh Staedler Churchill, MountainSky Landscaping LLC Related [+]. (Conrardy, Aaron)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Friday, October 25, 2024
18 18 order Compliance With Rules Fri 10/25 2:49 PM
Order For Compliance Related [+]. Rules Compliance due by 11/1/2024 for17 , (td)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
17 17 motion Withdraw As Attorney Fri 10/25 11:25 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by J. Aaron Atkinson for Hackstaff Snow Atkinson & Griess, LLC . (td)
Related: [-]
16 16 order File Fri 10/25 9:27 AM
Order For Status Report . Document due by 11/7/2024 (td)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
15 15 order File Wed 07/19 11:03 AM
Order Granting Joint Motion To Extend Abeyance In Adversary Proceeding. Related [+]. Document due by 8/9/2023 for14 , (td)
Related: [-] 14 Motion
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
14 14 motion Motion Tue 07/18 9:11 AM
Motion Extending Abeyance in Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kia Marisa Miller on behalf of Gregory Jones, Valerie Jones Related [+]. (Miller, Kia)
Related: [-] 11 Motion
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Monday, July 17, 2023
court Public Entry Regarding Case Reassignment Mon 07/17 1:26 PM
Notice of Reassignment of Case. Judge Kimberley H. Tyson added to case. Involvement of Judge Michael E. Romero terminated. This reassignment is for internal purposes only. Any hearing currently scheduled may be rescheduled. A separate notice will be issued if a hearing is rescheduled. Any pleadings in this matter must display the initials KHT after the case number. (leg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
13 13 order Other Order Thu 07/06 1:01 PM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Abeyance in Adversary Proceeding. Related [+]. (saa)
Related: [-] 11 Motion
12 12 order Other Order Thu 06/22 2:35 PM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Abeyance in Adversary Proceeding. Related [+]. (saa)
Related: [-] 11 Motion
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
11 11 motion Motion Wed 06/21 5:04 PM
Motion Extending Abeyance of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kia Marisa Miller on behalf of Gregory Jones, Valerie Jones, MountainSky Landscaping LLC Related [+]. (Miller, Kia)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Monday, March 27, 2023
9 9 order Abeyance Mon 03/27 10:55 AM
Order Granting Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Related [+]. Document due by 6/21/2023 for1 , (saa)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, March 24, 2023
10 10 notice 9013-1.1 Notice Mon 03/27 12:50 PM
9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Bailey C. Pompea on behalf of Gregory Jones , Valerie Jones Related [+].. 9013 Objections due by 3/31/2023 for8 , . (saa)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
8 8 motion Withdraw As Attorney Fri 03/24 3:12 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Bailey C. Pompea on behalf of Gregory Jones, Valerie Jones. (Pompea, Bailey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other 9013-1.1 Notice
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order
7 7 motion Abeyance Fri 03/24 9:09 AM
Joint Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by Bailey C. Pompea on behalf of Gregory Jones, Valerie Jones. (Pompea, Bailey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
6 6 order File Tue 02/28 2:06 PM
Order for Compliance with Rule 7026 Fed.R.Bankr.P. (Rule 26(f), Fed.R.Civ.P.) Related [+]. Document due by 3/30/2023 for1 , (saa)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, February 27, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/27 9:39 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of Luca Staedler Churchill, Peter Scott Churchill, Shiloh Staedler Churchill, MountainSky Landscaping LLC Related [+]. (Conrardy, Aaron)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 02/01 3:01 PM
Summons Service Executed On: MountainSky Landscaping, LLC, Peter Churchill, Luca Churchill, Shiloh Churchill - 2/1/2023 Filed by Bailey C. Pompea on behalf of Gregory Jones, Valerie Jones. (Pompea, Bailey)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 01/27 2:30 PM
Summons Issued on Luca Staedler Churchill Answer Due 02/27/2023; Peter Scott Churchill Answer Due 02/27/2023; Shiloh Staedler Churchill Answer Due 02/27/2023; MountainSky Landscaping LLC Answer Due 02/27/2023. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Pompea, Bailey)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 01/27 2:27 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-01019 MER] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31776285. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/27 2:26 PM
Adversary case 23-01019 Complaint by Valerie Jones, Gregory Jones against MountainSky Landscaping LLC, Peter Scott Churchill, Shiloh Staedler Churchill, Luca Staedler Churchill. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 05/30/2023 (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (Pompea, Bailey)
Related: [-]