Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:23-md-03056
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2023
Terminated:Dec 16, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, December 16, 2024
157 157 misc Judgment - Clerk Mon 12/16 4:45 PM
ATTORNEY FEE JUDGMENT. It is Ordered and adjudged that Class Counsel recover $2,000,000.00 for their fees and $87,213.57 for their expenses in the case. (jbu)
Related: [-]
156 156 16 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Settlement Mon 12/16 4:37 PM
ORDER OF FINAL APPROVAL granting154 Motion for Settlement. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses151 hereby grants the Motion and awards Class Counsel (as well as any agents, vendors or experts with which they may have worked on this matter) $2,000,000.00 for their fees and $87,213.57.00 for their expenses in the case. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case and all associated member cases. (See order for further details.) Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/16/2024. (jbu)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 12/16 4:47 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 12/13 2:44 PM
Submission of154 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement , to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
155 155 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 12/16 8:21 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steven D. Grimberg: Motion hearing held on December 9, 2024. The Court GRANTED154 Motion for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and151 Motion for Attorney Fees. Separate order to follow. (Court Reporter Alicia Bagley)(jbu)
Related: [-]