Consolidated
Lead case: 1:23-md-03056

Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:23-cv-00672
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2023
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Case in other court:Ohio Northern, 1:22-cv-01885
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2023 6:41 AM EDT
Defendant
KeyCorp
Represented By
James A.. Slater
Baker & Hostetler Llp-Oh
contact info
Lisa M. Ghannoum
Baker & Hostetler Llp-Oh
contact info
Defendant
Keybank National Association
Represented By
James A.. Slater
Baker & Hostetler Llp-Oh
contact info
Lisa M. Ghannoum
Baker & Hostetler Llp-Oh
contact info
Defendant
Overby-Seawell Company
Plaintiff
Michael Brouty
Represented By
James J. Pizzirusso
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
Steven Nathan
Hausfeld, LLP
contact info
Mark Abramowitz
Dicello Levitt And Casey LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Kauffman
Represented By
James J. Pizzirusso
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
Steven Nathan
Hausfeld, LLP
contact info
Mark Abramowitz
Dicello Levitt And Casey LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lebertus Vanderwerff
Represented By
James J. Pizzirusso
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
Steven Nathan
Hausfeld, LLP
contact info
Mark Abramowitz
Dicello Levitt And Casey LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order Thu 10/10 8:57 AM
ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE these cases for docket management purposes pending the Final Approval Hearing in the multidistrict case, set for 12/9/2024 before undersigned. If appropriate after the Final Approval Hearing, any or all of these cases may be reopened on a motion filed by any party. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/9/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 10/10 9:33 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (tas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/06 2:23 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Attorneys James A. Slater and Lisa M. Ghannoum re15 Standing Order. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
15 15 30+ pgs order Order Thu 07/06 2:21 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 7/5/23. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
14 14 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 02/14 1:13 PM
Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:22-cv-01885. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs misc Order from Other Court Tue 02/14 9:04 AM
Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 1) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 3056 Overby-Seawell Company Customer Data security Breach Litigation. Case transferred to the Northern District of Georgia and assigned to the Honorable Steven D. Grimberg. (P,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
12 12 Order that this action is stayed pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in In re KeyBank Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 3056, on whether the KeyBank/OSC data breach litigation will be centralized. All deadlines, including Answer dates for KeyBank and Overby-Seawell Company, are hereby stayed pending further Order of this Court. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 1/5/2023. Related Document9 .(S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order in 22cv1536
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
11 11 Reply in support of9 Motion to stay action pending disposition of motion for transfer and centralization pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by KeyBank National Association, KeyCorp. (Slater, James) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
10 10 Opposition to9 Motion to stay action pending disposition of motion for transfer and centralization pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by Michael Brouty, Melissa Kauffman, Lebertus Vanderwerff. (Abramowitz, Mark) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
9 9 Motion to stay action pending disposition of motion for transfer and centralization pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, filed by KeyBank National Association, KeyCorp.. (Slater, James) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
8 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KeyCorp. (Slater, James) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent KeyCorp for KeyBank National Association filed by KeyBank National Association. (Slater, James) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
6 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Michael Brouty, Lebertus Vanderwerff, Melissa Kauffman. Overby-Seawell Company waiver sent on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/7/2023, filed on behalf of Michael Brouty; Lebertus Vanderwerff; Melissa Kauffman. (Abramowitz, Mark) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
5 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. KeyBank National Association waiver sent on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/7/2023; KeyCorp waiver sent on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/7/2023 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abramowitz, Mark) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Steven M. Nathan for Michael Brouty, Melissa Kauffman, and Lebertus Vanderwerff. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Related [+]. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 11/4/2022.(S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-] 3
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney James J. Pizzirusso for Michael Brouty, Melissa Kauffman and Lebertus Vanderwerff. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Related [+]. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 11/4/2022.(S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, November 03, 2022
4 4 Motion for attorney James J. Pizzirusso to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11696181, filed by Michael Brouty, Melissa Kauffman, Lebertus Vanderwerff.(Abramowitz, Mark) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Declaration of James J. Pizzirusso,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of James J. Pizzirusso
3 3 Motion for attorney Steven M. Nathan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number BOHNDC-11696106, filed by Michael Brouty, Melissa Kauffman, Lebertus Vanderwerff.(Abramowitz, Mark) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Declaration of Steven M. Nathan,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Steven M. Nathan
Thursday, October 20, 2022
2 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (F,AW) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (F,AW) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (F,AW) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
1 1 Class Action Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11671389. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:22-cv-01536 . Filed by Michael Brouty, Lebertus Vanderwerff, Melissa Kauffman. (Abramowitz, Mark) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet