Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:23-ap-05022
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2023
Terminated:Sep 29, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
C&C Industrial, LLC
Represented By
C&C Industrial, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust
Represented By
Aaron L. Hammer
Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, September 29, 2023
court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 09/29 8:49 AM
Adversary Proceeding 23-5022 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal (Adversary) Thu 09/28 2:52 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/03 1:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by M. Tyler Powell Filed by on behalf of C&C Industrial, LLC. (Powell, M. Tyler)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
3 3 court Summons Service Executed Thu 02/09 3:53 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Delman, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, February 06, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Mon 02/06 10:00 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/03 5:40 PM
Adversary case 23-05022 Complaint, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC against C&C Industrial, LLC Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A