Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:23-ap-05024
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2023
Terminated:Jan 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jimmy Tudor
9032 Richmond Road
Paint Lick, KY 40444
Represented By
Jimmy Tudor
contact info
Plaintiff
Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust
Represented By
Aaron L. Hammer
Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, January 12, 2024
court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/12 10:30 AM
Adversary Proceeding 23-5024 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/22 1:16 PM
Certificate of Service, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC Related [+]. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
9 9 order Default Judgment Fri 12/22 10:04 AM
Order GRANTING Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] (bjp)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, December 21, 2023
8 8 audio Audio File Thu 12/21 2:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/21/2023 9:47:09 AM ]. File Size [ 53 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:13 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Hearing Held Thu 12/21 1:54 PM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held Related [+]. (alf)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
6 6 motion Default Judgment Wed 12/06 4:07 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Jimmy Tudor a/k/a Jimmy Keith Tudor, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/21/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 SCRA Status Report
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/18 4:26 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default, Jimmy Tudor aka Jimmy Keith Tudor. (rah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
4 4 motion Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/13 4:05 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 SCRA Status Report
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 09, 2023
3 3 court Summons Service Executed Thu 02/09 4:03 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Delman, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, February 06, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Mon 02/06 10:14 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/03 5:56 PM
Adversary case 23-05024 Complaint, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC against Jimmy Tudor Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A