Consolidated
Lead case: 1:21-md-03010

New York Southern District Court
Judge:P Kevin Castel
Case #: 1:23-cv-01530
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade)
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2023
Re-opened:Sep 26, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Aug 27, 2023 7:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Alphabet Inc.
Represented By
Eric P Schroeder
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp - Atl
contact info
Justina K. Sessions
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP
contact info
Kimberly Joanne Broecker
Williams & Connolly, Llp -Dc
contact info
Carol Joan Pruski
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
John E. Schmidtlein
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Brian McKinley Underwood, Jr.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp - Atl
contact info
Defendant
Google LLC
Represented By
Eric P Schroeder
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp - Atl
contact info
Justina K. Sessions
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP
contact info
Kimberly Joanne Broecker
Williams & Connolly, Llp -Dc
contact info
Carol Joan Pruski
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
John E. Schmidtlein
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Brian McKinley Underwood, Jr.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp - Atl
contact info
Defendant
John Doe's 1-100
Defendant
Youtube L.L.C.
Represented By
Eric P Schroeder
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp - Atl
contact info
Justina K. Sessions
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP
contact info
Kimberly Joanne Broecker
Williams & Connolly, Llp -Dc
contact info
Carol Joan Pruski
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
John E. Schmidtlein
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Brian McKinley Underwood, Jr.
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp - Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Inform Inc.
Represented By
Serina M. Vash
Herman Jones
contact info
Peter M. Jones
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
John C. Herman
Herman Jones
contact info
Carlton R. Jones
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Google Inc,
Terminated: 10/09/2020
Defendant
Youtube, Inc.
Terminated: 10/09/2020


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
107 107 misc Letter Thu 05/08 9:38 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated May 8, 2025 re: (967) LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated May 2, 2025 re: Pre-Motion Letter on Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-01530-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
106 106 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/02 6:24 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment as to Informs Third Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated May 2, 2025. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC, Youtube L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-01530-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
Related: [-]