California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 8:23-cv-00350
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2023
Terminated:Jun 29, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 26, 2023 3:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Southwest Dealer Services Inc
Represented By
B. Trent Webb
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Mayela C. Montenegro-Urch
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Emily R. Sosolik
Shook, Hardy And Bacon L. L. P.
contact info
Mary J. Peal
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Patrick A. Lujin
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
VOXX International Corp.
Represented By
Brian R. Gilchrist
Allen Dyer Doppelt And Gilchrist PA
contact info
Ryan T. Santurri
Allen Dyer Doppelt And Gilchrist PA
contact info
Aaron Richard Hand
Bunsow De Mory LLP
contact info
Hillary N. Bunsow
Bunsow De Mory LLP
contact info
Denise M De Mory
Bunsow De Mory LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 06, 2025
65 65 order Attorney Fees Thu 02/06 2:59 PM
DEFENDANT SOUTHWEST DEALER SERVICES, INC.'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES56 by Judge George H Wu. The Court's Tentative Ruling on Defendant's Motion56 was issued on February 5, 202564 . Oral argument is held. The Tentative Ruling is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees.; denying56 MOTION for Attorney Fees. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
64 64 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 02/05 11:28 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES by Judge George H Wu. Attached hereto is the Court's Tentative Ruling on Motion for Attorney Fees set for hearing on February 6, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
63 63 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 02/04 11:46 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Senior District Judge George H. Wu: The parties are advised that the MOTION HEARING56 , set for Thursday, February 6, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. will be held in-person. Masks are required. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]