Original Case: 8:23-cv-00350

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cvpri-02215
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2023
Terminated:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 04, 2024 4:21 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
SOUTHWEST DEALER SERVICES INC.
Represented By
Emily Sosolik
Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP
contact info
Basil Trent Webb
Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP
contact info
B. Trent Webb
Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP
contact info
Patrick A. Lujin
Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP
contact info
Mary Peal
Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
VOXX INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Represented By
Denise Marie De Mory
Bunsow De Mory LLP
contact info
Brian R. Gilchrist
Allen, Dyer, Doppelt & Gilchrist, PA
contact info
Ryan Santurri
Allen, Dyer, Doppelt, Milbrath & Gilchrist, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/04/2024 4:21 AM EST
Monday, July 31, 2023
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 07/25/2023. [939399] Entry of Appearance is due on 08/14/2023. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/14/2023. Docketing Statement is due on 08/14/2023. Appellant's brief is due on 09/29/2023. [ALK] [Entered: 07/31/2023 09:27 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 24 pgs Civil Case Docketed