Kansas District Court
Judge:Julie A Robinson
Referred: Rachel E Schwartz
Case #: 2:23-cv-02088
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2023
Terminated:Aug 20, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 31, 2023 6:31 AM CDT
Defendant
Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas
Represented By
Spencer Low
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Ryan B. Denk
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexandra Bradley
Represented By
Bert S. Braud
The Popham Law Firm, PC
contact info

GPO Aug 20 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 38 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 8/20/2024. (mam)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, November 21, 2024
60 60 appeal Mandate Thu 11/21 9:11 AM
APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA dismissing appeal (Appeal No. 24-3139 .(ca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter