Original Case: 2:23-cv-02088

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-03139
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Terminated:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 22, 2024 3:07 AM MST
Defendant - Appellee
UNIFIED GOVERNMENT OF WYANDOTTE COUNTY/KANSAS CITY, KANSAS, as representative of Kansas City Board of Public Utilities
Represented By
Ryan B. Denk
McAnany, Van Cleave & Phillips
contact info
Spencer Low
McAnany, Van Cleave & Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ALEXANDRA BRADLEY
Represented By
Bert Stephen Braud
Popham Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/22/2024 3:07 AM MST
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
[11120080] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/11/2024. Notice of appearance, transcript order form and docketing statement due 09/25/2024 for Alexandra Bradley. Notice of appearance due on 09/25/2024 for Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas. 24-3139
Related: [-]
Att: 1 44 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil