Campbell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph Dawson, III |
Referred: | Mary Gordon Baker |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01011 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
appeal
Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA
Mon 04/08 10:58 AM
Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re21 Notice of Appeal. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (tsim, ) (Main Document 22 replaced on 4/8/2024) (tsim, ). Modified on 4/8/2024 to replace incorrect document with correct document.(tsim, ) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 04/05 4:58 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to19 Order on Report and Recommendation, Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Joyce Turman Campbell. - The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Mayes, W) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Judgment
Wed 02/07 9:14 AM
JUDGMENT: Decision of the Commissioner is Affirmed. (tsim, ) |
|
19 | 19
6
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 02/07 8:58 AM
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 14 and AFFIRMS the Commissioner's decision. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 2/7/2024.(tsim, ) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Reply Not to a Motion
Thu 01/11 1:17 PM
REPLY by Commissioner of Social Security Administration to16 Objection to Report and Recommendation . (Casey, Theresa) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Thu 12/28 11:59 PM
OBJECTION to14 Report and Recommendation by Joyce Turman Campbell. Reply to Objections due by 1/11/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Mayes, W) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 12/28 12:02 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to file objections by Joyce Turman Campbell. Response to Motion due by 1/11/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Mayes, W) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Report and Recommendation
Wed 12/13 2:24 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint - Social Security filed by Joyce Turman Campbell. It is therefore RECOMMENDED that the Commissioner's decision be AFFIRMED. IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 12/27/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/13/2023. (tsim, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Defendant's Social Security Brief
Tue 08/15 12:41 PM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Response Brief Due by 8/29/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Casey, Theresa) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
respoth
Plaintiff's Social Security Brief
Mon 07/17 11:59 PM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF by Joyce Turman Campbell. Defendant Brief due by 8/16/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Mayes, W) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Thu 07/06 9:45 AM
TEXT ORDER. The Commissioner filed an Answer to the Complaint on May 4, 2023, and, after receiving an extension, Plaintiff's brief was due by July 5, 2023. (Dkt. Nos. 7; 8; 9.) Plaintiff has failed to file a brief. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have through July 17, 2023, in which to file a brief. Plaintiff is advised that if she fails to respond by this date, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b), and for failure to comply with this Courts orders, pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the factors outlined in Chandler Leasing Corp. v. Lopez, 669 F.2d 919, 920 (4th Cir.1982). See Ballard v. Carlson, 882 F.2d 93 (4th Cir. 1989). The dismissal will be considered an adjudication on the merits, i.e., with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 7/6/23. (akob, ) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 06/01 10:42 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time file Plaintiff's brief by Joyce Turman Campbell. Response to Motion due by 6/15/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Mayes, W) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 06/01 11:09 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Brief is due July 5, 2023. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 06/01/2023. (mdoe, ) |
||
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer/Electronic Certified Administrative Record
Thu 05/04 2:45 PM
ANSWER/ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Brief due by 6/5/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Leach, David) |
|
Att: 1 part 2 of 2 | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 9:45 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 03/14/2023. (mdoe, ) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 9:22 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joyce Turman Campbell. Response to Motion due by 3/27/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker. (tsim, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security Cases Only
Tue 03/14 9:20 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Joyce Turman Campbell. Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.03 regarding Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website. (tsim, ) |
|
misc
Set Answer Deadline - Social Security Complaint
Tue 03/14 9:24 AM
Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Set Answer Deadline - Social Security Complaint: Answer due from Commissioner of Social Security Administration on 5/12/2023. (tsim, ) |