Joyce Campbell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Original Case: 2:23-cv-01011
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.ss-01298 |
Type | civil social security / united states |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 4:20 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOYCE TURMAN CAMPBELL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/10/2024 4:15 AM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
Social Security case docketed. Originating case number: 2:23-cv-01011-JD. Date notice of appeal filed: 04/05/2024. Case manager: TBarton. [1001549871] 24-1298 TB [Entered: 04/09/2024 12:30 PM] | ||
1 | 1 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1001549871-2] social security case. Originating case number: 2:23-cv-01011-JD. Mailed to: Theresa Ann Casey. [1001549898] 24-1298 TB [Entered: 04/09/2024 12:49 PM] | |
2 | 2 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD requested (counseled cases) . Was administrative record filed in electronic form in district court? Yes. [1001549912] Administrative Record (Social Security) due 04/23/2024. 24-1298 TB [Entered: 04/09/2024 12:53 PM] |