Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:22-bk-33553

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:23-ap-03035
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alexander E. Jones
Suite 425
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Alexander E. Jones
contact info
Defendant
Free Speech Systems, LLC
66 Granburg Circle
San Antonio, TX 78218
Represented By
Free Speech Systems, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Neil Heslin
Attention: Avi Moshenberg 1001 Fannin Street Suite 2700
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Jarrod B. Martin
Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams & Aughtry P.C.
contact info
Avi Moshenberg
Mcdowell Hetherington LLP
contact info
Jennifer Jaye Hardy
Willkie Farr Gallagher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Scarlett Lewis
Attention: Avi Moshenberg 1001 Fannin Street Suite 2700
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Jarrod B. Martin
Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams & Aughtry P.C.
contact info
Avi Moshenberg
Mcdowell Hetherington LLP
contact info
Jennifer Jaye Hardy
Willkie Farr Gallagher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Leonard Pozner
Attention: Avi Moshenberg 1001 Fannin Street Suite 2700
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Jarrod B. Martin
Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams & Aughtry P.C.
contact info
Avi Moshenberg
Mcdowell Hetherington LLP
contact info
Jennifer Jaye Hardy
Willkie Farr Gallagher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Veronique De La Rosa
Attention: Avi Moshenberg 1001 Fannin Street Suite 2700
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Jarrod B. Martin
Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams & Aughtry P.C.
contact info
Avi Moshenberg
Mcdowell Hetherington LLP
contact info
Jennifer Jaye Hardy
Willkie Farr Gallagher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Marcel Fontaine
1001 Fannin Street Suite 2700
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Jarrod B. Martin
Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams & Aughtry P.C.
contact info
Avi Moshenberg
Mcdowell Hetherington LLP
contact info
Jennifer Jaye Hardy
Willkie Farr Gallagher LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 19 2023
Memorandum Decision on Texas Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Jones (Related document(s):27 Motion For Summary Judgment). Signed on 10/19/2023. (RosarioSaldana)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
court Hearing Cont Tue 05/06 2:35 PM
Hearing Continued on Related [+]. The Hybrid Status Conference scheduled for 5/9/2025 is cancelled and reset to 6/5/2025 at 01:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (rgs4)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
court Hearing Set Tue 04/29 4:07 PM
Hearing Set On Related [+]. Hybrid Status Conference is scheduled for 5/9/2025 at 01:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (rgs4)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint