Member Case
Lead case is: 4:22-bk-60043

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:22-bk-33553
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Jul 23, 2024
Claims Deadline:Oct 01, 2024
Converted:Jun 14, 2024
Discharge Objection Deadline:Sep 16, 2024

Debtor
Alexander E. Jones
Suite 425
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Shelby A Jordan
Jordan & Ortiz, PC
contact info
Christina Walton Stephenson
Elliott, Thomason & Gibson, LLP
contact info
Vickie L Driver
Elliott, Thomason & Gibson, LLP
contact info
Ben C Broocks
Broocks Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP 2300 N. Field Street, Suite 1800
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Anna Kordas
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
David Franklin Hill, IV
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Melanie A. Miller
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Marty L Brimmage
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Theodore James Salwen
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Trustee
Melissa A Haselden
Haselden Farrow PLLC Pennzoil Place 700 Milam Suite 1300
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Elizabeth Carol Freeman
The Law Office Of Liz Freeman
contact info
Melissa A Haselden
Haselden Farrow PLLC
contact info
Trustee
Christopher R Murray
Jones Murray LLP 602 Sawyer St Ste 400
Houston, TX 77007
Represented By
Jacqueline Chiba
Jones Murray LLP
contact info
Joshua W. Wolfshohl
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
Erin Elizabeth Jones
Jones Murray LLP
contact info
Christopher R Murray
Jones Murray LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Jayson B. Ruff
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Ha Minh Nguyen
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/04/2025 9:44 AM CST
Friday, December 02, 2022
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 12/02 7:42 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jayson B. Ruff (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 12/02 7:52 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ha Minh Nguyen (Nguyen, Ha)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Fri 12/02 6:05 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Alexander E. Jones. (Driver, Vickie)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 12/02 8:37 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jarrod B. Martin Filed by on behalf of Marcel Fontaine, Veronique De La Rosa, Leonard Pozner, Scarlett Lewis, Neil Heslin (Martin, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs misc Certificate of Credit Counseling Fri 12/02 9:12 AM
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Filed By Alexander E. Jones ). (Driver, Vickie)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 12/02 4:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Raymond William Battaglia Filed by on behalf of Free Speech Systems, LLC (Battaglia, Raymond)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 12/02 4:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ryan E Chapple Filed by on behalf of Robert Parker, William Sherlach, William Aldenberg, Jillian Soto-Marino, Carlos M Soto, Carlee Soto Parisi, Donna Soto, Jennifer Hensel, Ian Hockley, Nicole Hockley, Mark Barden, Jacqueline Barden, Francine Wheeler, David Wheeler (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 6 pgs motion Joint Administration Fri 12/02 5:09 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Alexander E. Jones (Stephenson, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion Generic Motion Fri 12/02 5:46 PM
Motion Requesting Status Conference Filed by Debtor Alexander E. Jones (Stephenson, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 12/02 7:55 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Shelby A Jordan Filed by on behalf of Alexander E. Jones (Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-]