Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:22-bk-33553

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:23-ap-03037
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 18, 2025 1:26 PM CDT
Attorney
Elliott, Thomason & Gibson, LLP
Suite 202
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Vickie L Driver
Elliott, Thomason & Gibson, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Free Speech Systems, LLC
66 Granburg Circle
San Antonio, TX 78218
Represented By
Ben C Broocks
Broocks Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Free Speech Systems, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Alexander E. Jones
Suite 425
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Ben C Broocks
Broocks Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Vickie L Driver
Elliott, Thomason & Gibson, LLP
contact info
Shelby A Jordan
Jordan & Ortiz, PC
contact info
Alexander E. Jones
contact info
Christina Walton Stephenson
Elliott, Thomason & Gibson, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Global Tetrahedron, LLC
Represented By
Gregg Jeffrey Costa
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos M. Soto
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Vida J Robinson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Stephanie P Lascano
Paul Weiss Et Al
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard M. Coan
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Eric Henzy
Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C.
contact info
Vida J Robinson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Stephanie P Lascano
Paul Weiss Et Al
contact info
John L. Cesaroni
Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C.
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Parker
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Vida J Robinson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Stephanie P Lascano
Paul Weiss Et Al
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
William Sherlach
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Vida J Robinson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Stephanie P Lascano
Paul Weiss Et Al
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
William Aldenberg
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Vida J Robinson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Stephanie P Lascano
Paul Weiss Et Al
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jillian Soto Marino
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Vida J Robinson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlee Soto-Parisi
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Vida J Robinson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Stephanie P Lascano
Paul Weiss Et Al
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Donna Soto
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Vida J Robinson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Stephanie P Lascano
Paul Weiss Et Al
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Hensel
303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850 Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Vida J Robinson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Stephanie P Lascano
Paul Weiss Et Al
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ian Hockley
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Hockley
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Vida J Robinson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Stephanie P Lascano
Paul Weiss Et Al
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Barden
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Barden
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Vida J Robinson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Stephanie P Lascano
Paul Weiss Et Al
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Francine Wheeler
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC Ryan E. Chapple 303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Vida J Robinson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Stephanie P Lascano
Paul Weiss Et Al
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Wheeler
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Vida J Robinson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Paul Andrew Paterson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Stephanie P Lascano
Paul Weiss Et Al
contact info
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info

GPO Oct 19 2023
Memorandum Decision of Connecticut Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Jones (Related document(s): 57 Motion For Summary Judgment). Signed on 10/19/2023. (RosarioSaldana)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
court Hearing Cont Tue 05/06 2:37 PM
Hearing Continued on Related [+]. The Hybrid Status Conference scheduled for 5/9/2025 is cancelled and reset to 6/5/2025 at 01:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (rgs4)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
court Hearing Set Tue 04/29 4:10 PM
Hearing Set On Related [+]. Hybrid Status conference to be held on 5/9/2025 at 01:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (rgs4)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint