Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:14-bk-34941
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Nov 21, 2014
Claims Deadline:Feb 19, 2015
Terminated:Dec 29, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Jun 04, 2015

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
ALCO Holdings, LLC
751 Freeport Parkway
Coppell, TX 75019
Represented By
Vincent P. Slusher
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Debtor
ALCO Stores, Inc., Debtor
751 Freeport Pkwy
Coppell, TX 75019-4411
Represented By
Vincent P. Slusher
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Debtor
ALCO Stores, Inc.
751 Freeport Pkwy
Coppell, TX 75019-4411
Represented By
Daniel M. Simon
Dla Piper, LLP
contact info
Thomas R. Califano
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Daniel G. Egan
Dla Piper, LLP
contact info
Vincent P. Slusher
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 26, 2014 8:53 PM CST
Attorney
Jeffrey L Cohen
Cooley LLP 1114 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036
Represented By
Judith W. Ross
Judith Ross, PC
contact info
Attorney
Jay R Indyke
Cooley LLP 1114 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036
Represented By
Judith W. Ross
Judith Ross, PC
contact info
Attorney
Law Offices of Judith W. Ross
700 N. Pearl St. Suite 1610
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Judith W. Ross
Judith Ross, PC
contact info
Attorney
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C.
Attorney
David A. Newby
Coman & Anderson P.C. 650 Warrenville Road, Suite 650
Lisle, IL 60532
Attorney
Showtime Sales & Marketing, Inc.
Harris, Finley & Bogle, PC 777 Main Street, Suite 1800
Ft. Worth, TX 76102
Represented By
Barbara Elaine Hargis
Harris, Finley & Bogle
contact info
Attorney
Neil M Snyder
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz 51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019
Attorney
Seth Van Aalten
Cooley LLP 1114 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036
Represented By
Judith W. Ross
Judith Ross, PC
contact info
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk LLC
830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Creditor
Alex Toys LLC
Represented By
Eric D. Novetsky
Jaffe Raitt Heuer & Weiss, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Michael Kaufman
Cox Smith Matthews Incorporated
contact info
Judith Greenstone Miller
Jaffee Raitt Heuer & Weiss, PC
contact info
Creditor
Alex Toys, LLC
Represented By
Aaron Michael Kaufman
Cox Smith Matthews Incorporated
contact info
Creditor
Allegro Media Group
Represented By
Mark Joseph Elmore
Elmore Law, PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Alliance Entertainment LLC
Represented By
Clint A. Corrie
Akerman LLP
contact info
Creditor
American Electric Power
Represented By
Weldon L. Moore, III
Sussman & Moore, L.L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Arizona Public Service Company
Represented By
Weldon L. Moore, III
Sussman & Moore, L.L.P.
contact info
John M. Craig
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Associated Wholesale Grocers
Represented By
Buffey E. Klein
Husch Blackwell, LLP
contact info
Mark T. Benedict
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bimbo Bakeries USA
255 Business Center Drive
Horsham, PA 19044
Creditor
Blackhawk Network, Inc
Represented By
Louis J Price
contact info
Creditor
Bottling Group, LLC d/b/a The Pepsi Bottling Company
Represented By
Joseph D. Frank
Frank-Gecker LLP
contact info
Creditor
CCA & B LLC
Represented By
Mark D. Sherrill
Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP
contact info
Creditor
Carter Leasing Corporation
1601 South Anderson Street P. O. Box 494
Elwood, IN 46036
Represented By
Michael E. Farrer
Bingham, Farrer & Wilson, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Sonia Chae
Securities & Exchange Commission 175 W. Jackson Blvd. Suite 900
Chicago, IL 60604
Represented By
Sonia A. Chae
Securities & Exchange Commission
contact info
Creditor
City of Coppell
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Laurie Spindler Huffman 2777 N. Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
City of Yoakum
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Diane W. Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Cocca Properties 10 LLC
100 DeBartolo Place Suite 400
Boardman, OH 44512
Represented By
William A. Myers
Law Office Of William A. Myers
contact info
Creditor
Cocca Properties 11, LLC
100 DeBartolo Place Suite 400
Boardman, OH 44512
Represented By
William A. Myers
Law Office Of William A. Myers
contact info
Creditor
Cocca Properties 12, LLC
100 DeBartolo Place Suite 400
Boardman, OH 44512
Represented By
William A. Myers
Law Office Of William A. Myers
contact info
Creditor
Cocca Properties 9 LLC
100 DeBartolo Place Suite 400
Boardman, OH 44512
Represented By
William A. Myers
Law Office Of William A. Myers
contact info
Creditor
Coface North America
50 Millstone Rd., Bldg. 100, Ste. 360
East Windsor, NJ 08520
Creditor
Cold Front Distribution., LLC
Represented By
Kenneth J. Buechler
contact info
Creditor
Coleman County TAD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Laurie Spindler Huffman 2777 N. Stemmons Fwy Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Coppell ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Laurie Spindler Huffman 2777 N. Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Core-Mark International, Inc.
1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4400
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
David A. Walton
Beirne, Maynard & Parsons, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Cotulla ISD
711 Navarro, Suite .300
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
David George Aelvoet
Linebarger, Goggan, Blair, & Sampson,llp
contact info
Creditor
County of Bosque, et al
P.O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Lee Gordon
Mccreary, Veselka, Bragg And Allen, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Cowley Distributing, Inc.
K&L Gates LLP 4350 Lassiter at North Hills Ave Suite 300 (27609), P.O. Box 17047
Raleigh, NC 27619
Represented By
Artoush Varshosaz
K & L Gates LLP
contact info
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Laurie Spindler Huffman 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste. 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
- Deloitte Transactions and Business Analytics LLP
2200 Ross Ave., Ste. 1600
Dallas, TX 75201
Creditor
Marcia Dillenbeck
Langley LLP 901 Main Street, Suite 600
Dallas, TX 75202
Represented By
Keith A. Langley
Langley LLP
contact info
Gina D. Shearer
Langley LLP
contact info
Creditor
Dorel Juvenile Group, Inc.
Represented By
Sujal M. Pandya
Barnes & Thornburg, LLP
contact info
Alan K. Mills
Barnes & Thornburg, LLP
contact info
Deborah M. Perry
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Duke Energy Indiana, Inc.
Represented By
Weldon L. Moore, III
Sussman & Moore, L.L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Dyno Merchandise, LLC
QSLWM, PC 2001 Bryan St., Ste. 1800
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
William Lawrence Medford, Jr.
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett Moser
contact info
Creditor
Dyno Seasonal Solutions, LLC
QSLWM, PC 2001 Bryan St., Ste. 1800
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
William Lawrence Medford, Jr.
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett Moser
contact info
Creditor
Eastman Family Trust
Represented By
David L. Campbell
Underwood Perkins, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Elavon, Inc.
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP 1700 Pacific Avenue Suite 4100
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Sarah A. Schultz
Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld, LLP
contact info
Creditor
FD Properties 9 LLC
100 DeBartolo Place Suite 400
Boardman, OH 44512
Represented By
William A. Myers
Law Office Of William A. Myers
contact info
Creditor
FIDC IX LLC
100 DeBartolo Place Suite 400
Boardman, OH 44512
Represented By
William A. Myers
Law Office Of William A. Myers
contact info
Creditor
FIDC VII LLC
100 DeBartolo Place Suite 400
Boardman, OH 44512
Represented By
William A. Myers
Law Office Of William A. Myers
contact info
Creditor
FIDC XXXIX LLC
100 DeBartolo Place Suite 400
Boardman, OH 44512
Represented By
William A. Myers
Law Office Of William A. Myers
contact info
Creditor
FIDC XXXVII LLC
Represented By
William A. Myers
Law Office Of William A. Myers
contact info
Creditor
FIDC XXXVIII LLC
100 DeBartolo Place Suite 400
Boardman, OH 44512
Represented By
William A. Myers
Law Office Of William A. Myers
contact info
Creditor
FLP, LLC
Represented By
Mark H. Ralston
Fishman Jackson
contact info
Creditor
Fegan Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By
Raymond J. Urbanik
Munsch, Hardt, Kopf & Harr PC
contact info
Creditor
Frito-Lay North America, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph D. Frank
Frank-Gecker LLP
contact info
Creditor
Michael Fuller
Langley LLP 901 Main Street, Suite 600
Dallas, TX 75202
Represented By
Keith A. Langley
Langley LLP
contact info
Gina D. Shearer
Langley LLP
contact info
Creditor
GE Capital Information Technology Solutions Inc
Bankruptcy Administration 1738 Bass Road P.O. Box 13708
Macon, GA 31208
Creditor
Georgia Power Company
Represented By
Weldon L. Moore, III
Sussman & Moore, L.L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Global Harvest Foods, Ltd.
16000 Christensen Rd. Ste. 300
Seattle, WA 98188
Represented By
Mark Joseph Elmore
Elmore Law, PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Hallmark Marketing Company
P.O. Box 419535 Mail Drop 316
Kansas City, MO 64141
Creditor
Hamilton Beach Brands, Inc.
4421 Waterfront Dr.
Glen Allen, VA 23060
Creditor
Hamilton CAD
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Diane W. Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger, Goggan, Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Heritage Partners Holdings
717 N. Crockett St.
Sherman, TX 75090
Represented By
William Riley Nix, Jr.
contact info
Creditor
c/o John T. Banks Hidalgo County
3301 Northland Dr., Ste. 505
Austin, TX 78731
Represented By
John T. Banks
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
JVZ, L.L.C.
Represented By
Ross Allen Plourde
Mcafee & Taff, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Jade Company, Inc.
William F. Harmeyer & Associates, P.C. 7322 Southwest Freeway Suite 475
Houston, TX 77074
Represented By
William F. Harmeyer
William F. Harmeyer & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Jim Hogg County
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Diane W. Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Josie Accessories, Inc.
Represented By
Michele K. Jaspan
Weltman & Moskowitz, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Knox Mall Bldg Acct, LLC
12770 Coit Road Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75251
Represented By
Eric A. Liepins
Eric A. Liepins, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
La Salle County
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott 3301 Northland Dr., Ste. 505
Austin, TX 78731
Represented By
John T. Banks
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Lavaca County
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Diane W. Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Lifeworks Technology Group, LLC
Represented By
Harlan M. Lazarus
Lazarus & Lazarus
contact info
Creditor
Live Oak CAD
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Diane W. Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Llano County
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Diane W. Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Lubbock Central Appraisal District
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott PO Box 817
Lubbock, TX 79408
Represented By
Laura Jane Monroe
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
MELRJ, LLLP #1 and MELRJ, LLLP #3
619 E. 2nd Street
Irving, TX 75060
Represented By
H Joseph Acosta
Acosta & Associates P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Mach Speed Technologies, LLC
Locke Lord LLP 2200 Ross Avenue Suite 2200
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Bradley Clay Knapp
Locke Lord LP
contact info
Creditor
Magnum Value Properties, LLC
12770 Coit Road Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75251
Represented By
Eric A. Liepins
Eric A. Liepins, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Matagorda County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger, Goggan, Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Merchandise, Inc.
5929 Ohio 128
Cleves, OH 45002
Represented By
Richard G. Grant
Culhane Meadows, PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Milnic Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Brian P. Gaffney
Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.
contact info
John O'Brien
Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit P.O Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105
Represented By
Stephen Christopher Conway
Missouri Department Of Revenue
contact info
Creditor
Mitchell County et al
PO Box 13430
Arlington, TX 76094
Represented By
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Monster Moto, LLC
Locke Lord, LLP 2200 Ross Avenue Suite 2200
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Bradley Clay Knapp
Locke Lord LP
contact info
Creditor
Mount Vernon ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP Suite 1000 2777 N Stemmons Fwy
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Muleshoe Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Brian P. Gaffney
Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.
contact info
John O'Brien
Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.
contact info
Creditor
National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
100 Jericho Quadrangle Suite 300 Attn: Adam L. Rosen
Jericho, NY 11753
Creditor
Nebraska Public Power District
Represented By
Gregory A. Lowry
Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP
contact info
Creditor
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Neil J. Orleans
Law Offices Of Judith W. Ross
contact info
Seth Van Aalten
Cooley, LLP
contact info
Jeffrey L. Cohen
Cooley LLP
contact info
Judith W. Ross
Judith Ross, PC
contact info
Jay R. Indyke
Cooley LLP
contact info
Creditor
Palacios ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger, Goggan, Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Paradise Kids, LLC
Represented By
Eric J. Snyder
Wilk Auslander, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Quay KFC Venture, LLC
Karl M. Schmitz, III 701 Enterprise Road East, Suite 502
Safety Harbor, FL 34695
Represented By
Karl M. Schmitz
contact info
Creditor
Rains County AD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Laurie Spindler Huffman 2777 N Stemmons Fwy Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Realty Income Corporation
901 Main Street Suite 6515
Dallas, TX 75202
Represented By
Mark A. Castillo
Curtis Castillo PC
contact info
Creditor
Red Point Paper Comapny
7180 Troy Hill Drive Suites J&K
Elkridge, MD 21075
Represented By
William L. Siegel
Cowles & Thompson. P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Ricoh USA
Recovery & Bankruptcy Group 3920 Arkwright Road, Suite 400
Macon, GA 31210
Creditor
Rosenthal & Rosenthal, Inc.
Melinda De Jesus 1370 Broadway
New York, NY 10018
Creditor
Sabine County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger, Goggan, Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Safeway Inc.
COMAN & ANDERSON P.C. 650 Warrenville Rd., Suite 500
Lisle, IL 60532
Represented By
Edwin Paul Keiffer
Wright Ginsberg Brusilow P.C.
contact info
David A. Newby
Coman And Anderson, PC
contact info
Creditor
San Saba County CAD
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Diane W. Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Schurle Signs, Inc.
Represented By
Raymond J. Urbanik
Munsch, Hardt, Kopf & Harr PC
contact info
Creditor
Seasonal Specialties LLC
Represented By
Bruce W. Akerly
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Creditor
Southern Exchange, L.P. d/b/a Texsport
Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C. 1601 Elm St. Suite 4600
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Micheal Wayne Bishop
Gray Reed & Mcgraw, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Spring Branch Independent School District
Represented By
Owen M. Sonik
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Jarden Consumer Solutions 2381 Executive Center Drive
Doca Raton, FL 33431
Creditor
Synchrony Bank
25 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 1120
Miami, FL 33131
Creditor
TCF Equipment Finance, Inc.
11100 Wayzata Blvd., Suite 801
Minnetonka, MN 55305
Represented By
Susan B. Hersh
Susan B. Hersh, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
TMM Investments Ltd
Anderson, Lehrman, Barre & Maraist LLP 1001 Third Street Suite 1
Corpus Christi, TX 78404
Represented By
Timothy P. Dowling
Anderson, Lehrman, Barre & Maraist, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Teichgraeber Enterprises, Inc.
QSLWM, PC 2001 Bryan St., Ste. 1800
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
William Lawrence Medford, Jr.
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett Moser
contact info
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Represented By
Jay W. Hurst
contact info
Creditor
The Lindy Bowman Company
7180 Troy Hill Drive Suites J&K
Elkridge, MD 21075
Represented By
William L. Siegel
Cowles & Thompson. P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Treasurer of Ellis County, State of Oklahoma
co Julia O'Neal PO Box 22
Arnett, OK 73832
Represented By
Julia O'Neal
contact info
Creditor
Treasurer of Washita County
Represented By
Julia O'Neal
contact info
Creditor
Variety Wholesalers, Inc.
Bruce W. Akerly Cantey Hanger LLP 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 3300
Dallas, TX 75201
Creditor
Vinton Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Brian P. Gaffney
Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.
contact info
John O'Brien
Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Ward County
711 Navarro, Suite 300
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
David George Aelvoet
Linebarger, Goggan, Blair, & Sampson,llp
contact info
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Water and Woods Gallery and Gifts, Inc. d/b/a Pacific and Maine
Represented By
Bruce W. Akerly
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Creditor
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By
Kevin J. Simard
Choate Hall & Stewart LLP
contact info
Jeffrey M. Wolf
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Sean M. Monahan
Choate Hall & Stewart, LLP
contact info
Clifton R. Jessup, Jr.
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Westar Energy, Inc.
Represented By
Weldon L. Moore, III
Sussman & Moore, L.L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Winkler County
711 Navarro, Suite 300
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
David George Aelvoet
Linebarger, Goggan, Blair, & Sampson,llp
contact info
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Wood County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Laurie Spindler Huffman 2777 N Stemmons Fwy Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Yoakum ISD
Represented By
Laurie Spindler Huffman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Diane W. Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Financial Advisor
Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.
10250 Constellation Blvd., 5th Fl
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Interested Party
Joint Venture Comprising Tiger Capital Group LLC, SB Capital Group LLC and Great American Group WF, LLC
Attn: Neil M. Snyder 51 West 52nd STreet
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Neil M. Snyder
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Samuel Martin Stricklin
Bracewell & Guiliani, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Texas Parks and Wildlife Department
Bankruptcy & Collections Division P. O. Box 12548 MC-008
Austin, TX 78711
Represented By
Christopher S. Murphy
Texas Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Trustee
Anthony Saccullo
Represented By
Neil J. Orleans
Law Offices Of Judith W. Ross
contact info
Judith W. Ross
Judith Ross, PC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242
Represented By
Erin Marie Schmidt
United States Trustee
contact info


1. Alco Stores to close locations following bankruptcy order (tulsaworld.com)
Submitted Mon 11/24/2014
2. Retailer Alco Stores Secures Interim Loan Approval (bloomberg.com)
Submitted Fri 10/17/2014
3. Alco Stores Files Chapter 11 Bankruptcy, to Liquidate or Sell (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Mon 10/13/2014
Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
1919 1919 notice Notice (generic) Tue 02/09 12:48 PM
Notice Records Transmittal and receipt filed by Trustee Anthony Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]