Member Case
Lead case is: 3:14-bk-34941

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:14-bk-34942
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2014
Terminated:Dec 30, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
ALCO Holdings, LLC, Debtor
751 Freeport Pkwy
Coppell, TX 75019-4411
Represented By
Vincent P. Slusher
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242


Docket last updated: 15 seconds ago
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
34 34 order Final decree Wed 12/30 9:15 AM
Final decree (Case closed) . Entered on 12/30/2020 (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
33 33 misc Operating report Tue 10/20 12:21 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period July 1, 2020 to September 30, 2020 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
32 32 misc Operating report Mon 07/20 3:23 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period April 1, 2020 to June 30,2020 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 20, 2020
31 31 misc Operating report Mon 04/20 12:47 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period January 1, 2020 to March 31, 2020 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2020
30 30 misc Operating report Mon 01/20 2:04 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period October 1, 2019 to December 31, 2019 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
29 29 misc Operating report Thu 10/17 1:59 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period July 1, 2019 to September 30, 2019 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2019
28 28 misc Operating report Fri 07/19 8:19 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period April 1, 2019 to June 30,2019 filed by Debtor ALCO Holdings, LLC. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
27 27 misc Operating report Wed 04/17 9:56 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period January 1, 2019 to March 31,2019 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 18, 2019
26 26 misc Operating report Fri 01/18 1:24 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period October 1, 2018 to December 31, 2018 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 16, 2018
25 25 misc Operating report Tue 10/16 11:24 AM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period July 1, 2018 to September 30, 2018 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 20, 2018
24 24 misc Operating report Fri 07/20 11:23 AM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period April 1, 2018 to June 30, 2018 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2018
23 23 misc Operating report Thu 04/19 5:44 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period 01/01/2018 to 03/31/2018 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
22 22 misc Operating report Fri 01/19 10:45 AM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period October 1, 2017 to December 31, 2017 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
21 21 misc Operating report Thu 10/19 10:46 AM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period 7/01/2017 to 9/30/2017 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
20 20 misc Operating report Tue 07/18 11:02 AM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period April 1, 2017 to June 30,2017 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2017
19 19 misc Operating report Thu 04/20 4:45 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period January 1, 2017 to March 31, 2017 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2017
18 18 misc Operating report Fri 01/20 1:53 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period October 1, 2016 to December 31, 2016 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2016
17 17 misc Operating report Thu 10/20 3:36 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period July 1, 2016 to September 30, 2016 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2016
16 16 misc Operating report Wed 07/20 4:17 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period 4/1/2016 to 6/30/2016 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2016
15 15 misc Operating report Wed 04/20 3:18 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period 1 1-2016 to 3 31-2016 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Orleans, Neil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2016
14 14 misc Operating report Wed 01/20 3:27 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period October 1, 2015 to December 31, 2015 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Ross, Judith)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2015
13 13 misc Operating report Mon 12/07 1:58 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period July 22, 2015 to September 30, 2015 filed by Trustee Anthony M Saccullo. (Ross, Judith)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 14, 2014
12 12 notice Notice (generic) Fri 11/14 9:23 PM
Notice of Filing of Schedules (Alco Holdings, LLC) filed by Debtor ALCO Holdings, LLC. (Slusher, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 18, 2014
11 11 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Sat 10/18 11:39 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/18/2014. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/21/2014 at 11:00 AM at Dallas, Room 976. Proofs of Claims due by 2/19/2015. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 11/14/2014.
Thursday, October 16, 2014
10 10 court BNC certificate of mailing Thu 10/16 11:53 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/16/2014. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A due 10/27/2014. Schedule B due 10/27/2014. Schedule D due 10/27/2014. Schedule E due 10/27/2014. Schedule F due 10/27/2014. Schedule G due 10/27/2014. Schedule H due 10/27/2014. Summary of Schedules and Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities and Related Data 28 USC sec. 159 due 10/27/2014. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/27/2014. Creditor matrix due 10/16/2014. Chapter 11 Plan due by 2/9/2015. (Calfee, J.)
9 9 order Joint administration Thu 10/16 12:02 PM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 3:14-bk-34941 with member case 3:14-bk-34942 Related [+] Entered on 10/16/2014. The Clerk of the Court shall maintain one file and one docket for all of thesejointly administered cases, which file and docket for each respective chapter 11 case shall be the file and docket for In re ALCO Stores, Inc., Case No. 14-34941 sgj11 (the Lead Case), and all orders, pleadings, papers and documents, except proofs of claims, shall be filed and docketed in the Lead Case. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of theFederal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of ALCO Stores, Inc. and ALCO Holdings, LLC. All further pleadings and other papers in this chapter 11 case shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in,Case No. 14-34941 sgj11 (ALCO Stores, Inc., et al.) (Zisk, B)
Related: [-] 8
7 7 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 10/16 10:22 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bruce W. Akerly filed by Creditor Variety Wholesalers, Inc.. (Akerly, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 15, 2014
6 6 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Wed 10/15 2:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Laurie Spindler Huffman filed by Creditor Dallas County. (Huffman, Laurie)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 & 12 Wed 10/15 11:14 AM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/21/2014 at 11:00 AM at Dallas, Room 976. Proofs of Claims due by 2/19/2015. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 11/14/2014. (Neary, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 14, 2014
4 4 misc Request for expedited consideration of first day matter Tue 10/14 4:20 PM
Request for expedited consideration of first day matter. Re: / Supplemental Request for Emergency Consideration of Certain "First Day" Matters filed by Debtor ALCO Holdings, LLC Related [+]. (Slusher, Vincent)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary petition (chapter 11)
3 3 court Notice of deficiency Tue 10/14 1:14 PM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A due 10/27/2014. Schedule B due 10/27/2014. Schedule D due 10/27/2014. Schedule E due 10/27/2014. Schedule F due 10/27/2014. Schedule G due 10/27/2014. Schedule H due 10/27/2014. Summary of Schedules and Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities and Related Data 28 USC sec. 159 due 10/27/2014. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/27/2014. Creditor matrix due 10/16/2014. Chapter 11 Plan due by 2/9/2015. (Calfee, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of deficiency Tue 10/14 12:51 PM
INCORRECT ENTRY: Filed in error. Notice of deficiency. Schedule A due 10/27/2014. Schedule B due 10/27/2014. Schedule D due 10/27/2014. Schedule E due 10/27/2014. Schedule F due 10/27/2014. Schedule G due 10/27/2014. Schedule H due 10/27/2014. Summary of Schedules and Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities and Related Data 28 USC sec. 159 due 10/27/2014. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/27/2014. Creditor matrix due 10/16/2014. B21/Tax ID due 10/16/2014.Statement of Income/Means Test Form due 10/27/2014. Chapter 11 Plan due by 2/9/2015. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 10/14/2014. Cash Flow Statement due 10/20/2014. Chapter 11 Small Business Balance Sheet due 10/20/2014. Chapter 11 Small Business Statement of Operations due 10/20/2014. (Calfee, J.) Modified on 10/14/2014 (Calfee, J.). Modified on 10/14/2014 (Calfee, J.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 12, 2014
8 8 motion Joint administration Thu 10/16 11:58 AM
Motion for joint administration of cases 14-34941 14-34942 Filed by Debtor ALCO Holdings, LLC (Zisk, B)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order
1 1 12 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Sun 10/12 11:34 PM
Chapter 11 voluntary petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by ALCO Holdings, LLC (Slusher, Vincent) (12 pgs)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Sun 10/12 11:35 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 14-34942 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 19737137, amount $1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 14-34942 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 19737137, amount $1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#