Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:23-ap-50337
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Center City Healthcare, LLC
230 North Broad Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
Center City Healthcare, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
IS BBFB LLC
IS BBFB LLC 2929 Walnut Street Suite 1540
Philadelphia, PA 19104
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Carbino
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl
contact info
Plaintiff
IS 245 NORTH 15TH LLC
IS 245 NORTH 15TH LLC 2929 Walnut Street Suite 1540
Philadelphia, PA 19104
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Carbino
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl
contact info

GPO Jan 10 2024
Memorandum Opinion Denying the Motion for Partial Dismissal of Amended Complaint with exceptions. (related document(s)7, 11, 12, 20, 21, 23, 24) (CAF)
GPO Jan 10 2024
Order to Dismiss Amended Complaint Granting in Part and Denying in Part (related document(s)7, 11, 12, 20, 21, 23, 24, 36) (CAF)
GPO Feb 26 2025
Opinion Denying Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (Hurt, Xavier)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
138 138 13 pgs court Opinion Wed 02/26 1:54 PM
Opinion Denying Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (Hurt, Xavier)
Related: [-]
137 137 order Judgment on Pleadings Wed 02/26 12:50 PM
Order Denying Judgment on Pleadings Related [+] Order Signed on 2/26/2025. (Hurt, Xavier)
Related: [-] 126