Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Kimberly A Jolson
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:23-cv-01390
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2023
Terminated:Mar 07, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2023 7:17 AM EDT
Defendant
The Ohio State University Wexner Medical Center
30 EAST BROAD STREET, 14TH FLOOR
COLUMBUS, OH 43215
Represented By
Scott Howard DeHart
Zashin & Rich Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Drew Corner Piersall
Zashin & Rich Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Solis
7999 EUROGREY COURT
BLACKLICK, OH 43004
Represented By
Ellen Mary Kramer
Cohen Rosenthal & Kramer LLP
contact info
Jason R Bristol
Cohen Rosenthal & Kramer, LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 07 2024
OPINION AND ORDER granting 25 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment & denying 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/7/2024. (kk2)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, January 30, 2025
50 50 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Order to Thu 01/30 5:11 PM
ORDER denying47 Plaintiff's Motion Review Clerks Taxation of Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/30/25. (sem)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
49 49 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 01/24 11:58 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re47 MOTION for Order to Review Clerk's Taxation of Costs filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Solis. (Kramer, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
48 48 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/23 9:58 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re47 MOTION for Order to Review Clerk's Taxation of Costs filed by Defendant The Ohio State University Wexner Medical Center. (Piersall, Drew)
Related: [-]